EP3671394 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR VEHICLE GUIDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2021/49] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property - Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Steven HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
MCCULLOUGH, Susan HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 03 /
MCGLOUGHLIN, David HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2021/49] |
Former [2020/26] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19217755.8 | 18.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | US201862784169P | 21.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862784169 P | US201916697968 | 27.11.2019 Original published format: US201916697968 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3671394 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3671394 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G05D1/10, G08G5/00, G01C23/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
G08G5/21 (EP);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G01C23/00 (EP);
G08G5/53 (EP);
G08G5/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON GRAFISCHEN BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHEN ZUR FAHRZEUGFÜHRUNG | [2020/26] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR VEHICLE GUIDANCE | [2020/26] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION D'INTERFACES UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUES DE GUIDAGE DE VÉHICULE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 24.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2019 | AL | 08.12.2021 | AT | 08.12.2021 | CY | 08.12.2021 | CZ | 08.12.2021 | DK | 08.12.2021 | EE | 08.12.2021 | ES | 08.12.2021 | FI | 08.12.2021 | HR | 08.12.2021 | IT | 08.12.2021 | LT | 08.12.2021 | LV | 08.12.2021 | MC | 08.12.2021 | MK | 08.12.2021 | MT | 08.12.2021 | NL | 08.12.2021 | PL | 08.12.2021 | RO | 08.12.2021 | RS | 08.12.2021 | SE | 08.12.2021 | SI | 08.12.2021 | SK | 08.12.2021 | SM | 08.12.2021 | IE | 18.12.2021 | LU | 18.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | BG | 08.03.2022 | NO | 08.03.2022 | GR | 09.03.2022 | IS | 08.04.2022 | PT | 08.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 18.12.2019 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 18.12.2019 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 08.12.2021 | |
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 08.12.2021 | |
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 08.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013179009 (GERSHZOHN GARY [US]); | [A]US8633913 (RAGHU KAUSHIK [US], et al); | [X]US9132913 (SHAPIRO GEOFFREY A [US], et al); | [A]US2018186467 (WONG JONATHAN MATTHEW [US], et al) |