EP3798215 - COVALENT PRINTING BY PHOTO-TRIGGERED CLICK LIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Nantes 1 quai de Tourville 44000 Nantes / FR | For all designated states Université d'Angers 40 rue de Rennes 49100 Angers / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELPIN, François-Xavier 2 rue des Closeaux 44800 Saint-Herblain / FR | 02 /
DENIS, Marie 15 allée Baco 44000 Nantes / FR | 03 /
GINDRE, Denis 6 rue Jean Arp 49000 Angers / FR | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19306203.1 | 26.09.2019 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798215 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14, C07D407/12, C09B41/00, C09D11/101 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP);
C07D407/12 (EP);
C09B57/02 (EP);
C09B69/109 (EP);
C09D11/03 (EP);
C09D11/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOVALENTES DRUCKEN DURCH PHOTOAUSGELÖSTE KLICK-LIGATION | [2021/13] | English: | COVALENT PRINTING BY PHOTO-TRIGGERED CLICK LIGATION | [2021/13] | French: | IMPRESSION COVALENTE PAR LIGATURE CLIC PHOTO DÉCLENCHÉE | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010210854 (POPIK VLADIMIR V [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim - *; | [A] - RULL-BARRULL J, "Photoresponsive cellulose paper as a molecular printboard for covalent printing", vol. 5, no. 21, doi:10.1039/C7TC01081H, ISSN 2050-7526, (2017), pages 5154 - 5162, JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY C,, URL: https://doi.org/10.1039/C7TC01081H?nosfx=y, XP009513684 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C7TC01081H | [A] - BROOKS ET AL., "Multifunctional surface manipulation using orthogonal click chemistry", LANGMUIR, (20160609), vol. 32, pages 6600 - 6605, XP002795724 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.langmuir.6b01591 | [A] - SELVANATHAN ARUMUGAM ET AL, "Sequential "Click" - "Photo-Click" Cross-Linker for Catalyst-Free Ligation of Azide-Tagged Substrates", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20140218), vol. 79, no. 6, doi:10.1021/jo500143v, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2702 - 2708, XP055164009 [A] 1-17 * figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo500143v | by applicant | - B. J. DE GANSP. C. DUINEVELDU. S. SCHUBERT, Adv. Mater., (20040000), vol. 16, pages 203 - 213 | - T. OHLUNDJ. ORTEGRENS. FORSBERGH.-E. NILSSON, Appl. Surf. Sci., (20120000), vol. 259, pages 731 - 739 | - L. L. DA LUZR. MILANIJ. F. FELIXI. R. B. RIBEIROM. TALHAVINIB. A. D. NETOJ. CHOJNACKIM. O. RODRIGUESS. A. JUNIOR, ACS Appl. Mater. Interfaces, (20150000), vol. 7, pages 27115 - 27123 | - N. SANDLERA. MAATTANENP. IHALAINENL. KRONBERGA. MEIERJOHANNT. VIITALAJ. PELTONEN, J. Pharm. Sci., (20110000), vol. 100, pages 3386 - 3395 | - R. D. BOEHMP. R. MILLERJ. DANIELSS. STAFSLIENR. J. NARAYAN, Mater. Today,, (20140000), vol. 17, pages 247 - 252 | - J. FINNELL, Library & Archival Security, (20110000), vol. 24, pages 19 - 24 | - J. RULL-BARRULLM. D'HALLUINE. LE GROGNECF.-X. FELPIN, J. Mat. Chem. C, (20170000), vol. 5, pages 5154 - 5162 | - G. BRETELJ. RULL-BARRULLM. C. NONGBEJ.-P. TERRIERE. LE GROGNECF.-X. FELPIN, ACS Omega, (20180000), vol. 3, pages 9155 - 9159 | - GULAKOVA, E. N.SITIN, A. G.KUZ'MINA, L. G.FEDOROVA, O. A., "Synthesis and Structure of Styryl-Substituted Azines", Russ. J. Org. Chem., vol. 47, no. 2, (20110000), pages 245 - 252, URL: https://doi.org/10.1134/S107042801102014X | - KOSIOVA, I.KOVACKOVA, S.KOIS, P., "Synthesis of Coumarin-Nucleoside Conjugates via Huisgen 1,3-Dipolar Cycloadditio", Tetrahedron, vol. 63, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tet.2006.10.075, (20070000), pages 312 - 320, URL: https://doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2006.10.075, XP008153813 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2006.10.075 |