blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3755230

EP3755230 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIMULTANEOUS 4D ULTRAFAST BLOOD FLOW AND TISSUE DOPPLER IMAGING OF THE HEART AND RETRIEVING QUANTIFICATION PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.04.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.06.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.11.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.08.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale)
101 rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Ecole Supérieure de Physique et de Chimie Industrielles de la Ville de Paris
10, rue Vauquelin
75005 Paris / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS-
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
For all designated states
SORBONNE UNIVERSITE
21, rue de l'École de Médecine
75006 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Université Paris Cité
85 boulevard Saint-Germain
75006 Paris / FR
[2022/32]
Former [2021/01]For all designated states
INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale)
101 rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Ecole Supérieure de Physique et de Chimie Industrielles de la Ville de Paris
10, rue Vauquelin
75005 Paris / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS-
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
For all designated states
SORBONNE UNIVERSITE
21, rue de l'École de Médecine
75006 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Université de Paris
85 boulevard Saint-Germain
75006 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / PERNOT, Mathieu
ESCPI PARIS- U979 INSERM CNRS 17 rue Moreau
75012 PARIS / FR
02 / PAPADACCI, Clément
Physics for Medicine Paris
Inserm U1273, ESPCI Paris, PSL Uni, CNRS PRE 2031
17 rue Moreau
75012 PARIS / FR
03 / TANTER, Mickael
ESPCI PARIS - U979 INSERM CNRS 17 rue Moreau
75012 PARIS / FR
 [2021/01]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2021/01]
Application number, filing date19704340.918.02.2019
[2021/01]
WO2019EP53920
Priority number, dateEP2018030517319.02.2018         Original published format: EP 18305173
[2021/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019158741
Date:22.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3755230
Date:30.12.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3755230
Date:24.05.2023
Language:EN
[2023/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2019
ClassificationIPC:A61B8/06, A61B8/08, A61B8/14, A61B8/00, G01S15/89, G01S7/52
[2021/01]
CPC:
A61B8/466 (EP); A61B8/0883 (EP,US); A61B8/06 (EP);
A61B8/065 (EP,US); A61B8/14 (EP); A61B8/145 (EP,US);
A61B8/4444 (US); A61B8/469 (EP); A61B8/483 (EP,US);
A61B8/488 (EP,US); A61B8/5207 (US); A61B8/5223 (EP,US);
A61B8/54 (US); G01S15/8927 (EP); G01S15/8979 (EP);
G01S7/52071 (EP); G06T13/20 (US); G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T7/70 (US); G16H30/20 (US); G16H30/40 (US);
G16H50/30 (EP); A61B8/4494 (US); G06T2207/10016 (US);
G06T2207/10136 (US); G06T2207/30048 (US); G06T2207/30104 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIMULTANEN ULTRASCHNELLEN 4D-DOPPLER-BILDGEBUNG VON BLUTFLUSS UND GEWEBE DES HERZENS UND ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG VON QUANTIFIZIERUNGSPARAMETERN[2022/51]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIMULTANEOUS 4D ULTRAFAST BLOOD FLOW AND TISSUE DOPPLER IMAGING OF THE HEART AND RETRIEVING QUANTIFICATION PARAMETERS[2021/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉCOULEMENT DE SANG ULTRARAPIDE 4D SIMULTANÉ ET IMAGERIE DOPPLER TISSULAIRE DU COEUR ET D'EXTRACTION DE PARAMÈTRES DE QUANTIFICATION[2022/51]
Former [2021/01]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIMULTANEN ULTRASCHNELLEN 4D-BILDGEBUNG DES BLUTFLUSSES UND ZUR GEWEBE-DOPPLER-BILDGEBUNG DES HERZENS UND ZUM ABRUFEN VON QUANTIFIZIERUNGSPARAMETERN
Former [2021/01]M& XC9;THODE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT UNE IMAGERIE DOPPLER ULTRARAPIDE 4D SIMULTAN& XC9;E DE D& XC9;BIT SANGUIN ET DE TISSU DU C& X152;UR ET UNE R& XC9;CUP& XC9;RATION DE PARAM& XC8;TRES DE QUANTIFICATION
Entry into regional phase06.07.2020National basic fee paid 
06.07.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2020Examination requested  [2020/53]
06.07.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.06.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2023Fee for grant paid
12.04.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)27.02.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.05.2023
CZ24.05.2023
DK24.05.2023
EE24.05.2023
FI24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
LT24.05.2023
LV24.05.2023
PL24.05.2023
RO24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
SI24.05.2023
SK24.05.2023
SM24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
[2024/25]
Former [2024/10]AT24.05.2023
CZ24.05.2023
DK24.05.2023
EE24.05.2023
FI24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
LT24.05.2023
LV24.05.2023
PL24.05.2023
RO24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
SK24.05.2023
SM24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2024/08]AT24.05.2023
FI24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
LT24.05.2023
LV24.05.2023
PL24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
SK24.05.2023
SM24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2024/03]AT24.05.2023
FI24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
LT24.05.2023
LV24.05.2023
PL24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2024/01]AT24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
LT24.05.2023
LV24.05.2023
PL24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2023/51]AT24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
PL24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2023/50]AT24.05.2023
PL24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2023/48]AT24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2023/46]PT25.09.2023
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2011208056  (DATTA SAURABH [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0046] *;
 [Y]US2013144161  (WANG YANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0079] , [0051] , [0030] , [0033] , [0087]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2015366532  (VOIGT INGMAR [DE], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * paragraphs [0072] , [0092] , [0046] , [0101] , [0080] *;
 [Y]US2016140730  (FALAHATPISHEH AHMAD [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * paragraphs [0085] , [0109] , [0122] , [0123] , [0091]; figure 13 *;
 [Y]US2017035393  (ABE YASUHIKO [JP]) [Y] 1,8* (S4b); paragraph [0063] *;
 [Y]WO2017069699  (SINGAPORE HEALTH SERV PTE LTD [SG]) [Y] 1,8 * page 21, line 7; page 31, line 15 *
by applicant   - J. PROVOST et al., "3D ultrafast ultrasound imaging in vivo", Phys. Med. Biol., (20141000), vol. 59, no. 19, page L1
    - MONTALDO, G.; TANTER, M.; BERCOFF, J.; BENECH, N.; FINK, M., "Coherent plane-wave compounding for very high frame rate ultrasonography and transient elastography", IEEE Trans. Ultrason. Ferroelectr. Freq. Control, (20090000), vol. 56, pages 489 - 506, XP011255897
    - NIKOLOV, S.I.; KORTBEK, J.; JENSEN, J.A., "Practical applications of synthetic aperture imaging, in: 2010 IEEE Ultrasonics Symposium (IUS)", Presented at the 2010 IEEE Ultrasonics Symposium (IUS), (20100000), pages 350 - 358
    - LOCKWOOD, G.R.; TALMAN, J.R.; BRUNKE, S.S., "Real-time 3-D ultrasound imaging using sparse synthetic aperture beamforming", IEEE Trans. Ultrason. Ferroelectr. Freq. Control, (19980000), vol. 45, doi:doi:10.1109/58.710573, pages 980 - 988, XP011437773

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/58.710573
    - PAPADACCI, C.; PERNOT, M.; COUADE, M.; FINK, M.; TANTER, M., "High-contrast ultrafast imaging of the heart", IEEE transactions on ultrasonics, ferroelectrics, and frequency control, (20140000), vol. 61, doi:doi:10.1109/TUFFC.2014.6722614, pages 288 - 301, XP011538140

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TUFFC.2014.6722614
    - KASAI, C.; NAMEKAWA, K.; KOYANO, A.; OMOTO, R., "1985. Real-Time Two-Dimensional Blood Flow Imaging Using an Autocorrelation Technique", IEEE Trans. Sonics Ultrason, vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1109/T-SU.1985.31615, pages 458 - 464, XP011404648

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/T-SU.1985.31615
    - DEMENE, C. et al., "Spatiotemporal Clutter Filtering of Ultrafast Ultrasound Data Highly Increases Doppler and Ultrasound Sensitivity", IEEE transactions on medical imaging, (20150000), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1109/TMI.2015.2428634, pages 2271 - 2285, XP011588384

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2015.2428634
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.