blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3769558

EP3769558 - APPLICATION NOTIFICATIONS FROM NETWORK FOR THROUGHPUT AND FLOW CONTROL ADAPTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.08.2023
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.12.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.09.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2023Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.09.2023  [2023/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2021/04]
Inventor(s)01 / LING, Jonathan
33 Silver Hollow
North Brunswick Township, New Jersey 08902 / US
02 / KIM, Bongho
216 Gordons Corner Rd
Morganville, New Jersey 07751 / US
 [2021/04]
Representative(s)Nokia EPO representatives
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2021/04]
Application number, filing date19709933.608.03.2019
[2021/04]
WO2019EP55890
Priority number, dateUS20181592627320.03.2018         Original published format: US201815926273
[2021/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019179792
Date:26.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3769558
Date:27.01.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2019
ClassificationIPC:H04W28/02, H04W80/02
[2021/04]
CPC:
H04W80/02 (EP,US); H04W28/10 (US); H04W24/02 (US);
H04W28/02 (EP,US); H04W28/0205 (US); H04W28/0226 (US);
H04L5/0055 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/04]
TitleGerman:ANWENDUNGSBENACHRICHTIGUNGEN VON EINEM NETZWERK ZUR DURCHSATZ- UND FLUSSSTEUERUNGSANPASSUNG[2021/04]
English:APPLICATION NOTIFICATIONS FROM NETWORK FOR THROUGHPUT AND FLOW CONTROL ADAPTATION[2021/04]
French:NOTIFICATIONS D'APPLICATION PROVENANT D'UN RÉSEAU POUR UNE ADAPTATION DE DÉBIT ET DE COMMANDE DE FLUX[2021/04]
Entry into regional phase20.10.2020National basic fee paid 
20.10.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2020Examination requested  [2021/04]
20.10.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2023Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2023/39]
25.05.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2023/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.202305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006104344  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,13,24 * page 2, line 9 - line 10 * * page 3, line 9 - line 15 * * page 5, line 17 - page 7, line 18 *;
 [A]WO2008136598  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1,13,24* page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 24 *;
 [A]EP2538618  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 11,23,34 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2013167647  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 1,13,24 * page 14, line 10 - line 24 *;
 [A]US2017127318  (GOEL ANUPAM KUMAR [IN], et al) [A] 1,13,24 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] *;
 [X]  - INTEL CORPORATION, "TP for X2-UP on Flow control enhancements", vol. RAN WG3, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170629, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-172297 TP FOR X2-UP ON FLOW CONTROL ENHANCEMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20170626), XP051302244 [X] 1-34 * paragraph [05.4] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.