EP3763678 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING NI/CO SULFIDE AND SYSTEM FOR STABILIZING IRON GRADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO., LTD. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Yukinori c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO., LTD., 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Daisuke c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO., LTD., 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | 03 /
OISHI, Takao c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO., LTD., 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19763429.8 | 07.03.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019JP09171 | Priority number, date | JP20180041314 | 07.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018041314 | [2021/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019172392 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763678 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/00, C22B3/08, C22B3/44, C22B23/00, C01G51/00, C01G53/11, C22B3/02, C22B3/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
C22B23/043 (EP);
C01G53/00 (EP);
C22B23/0461 (EP);
C22B3/02 (EP);
C01P2006/80 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | C01G53/00, C22B3/08, C22B3/44, C22B23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NI/CO-SULFID UND SYSTEM ZUR STABILISIERUNG DER EISENQUALITÄT | [2021/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING NI/CO SULFIDE AND SYSTEM FOR STABILIZING IRON GRADE | [2021/02] | French: | MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION DE SULFURE DE NI/CO ET SYSTÈME DE STABILISATION DE TENEUR EN FER | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2020 | Translation filed | 17.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 03.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]JP2016194124 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [Y] 1, 3, 4 * , * [A] 2, 5-8; | [YA]JP2017141499 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [Y] 1, 3, 4 * , * [A] 2, 5-8; | [PX]JP2018141179 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [PX] 1, 3, 4* , * | by applicant | JP2010126778 | JP2018041314 |