EP3746907 - DYNAMICALLY EVOLVING HYBRID PERSONALIZED ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YADAV, Anil Sunder 665 Clyde Ave. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Gurmeet 665 Clyde Ave. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
NEELAGIRI, Divya 665 Clyde Ave. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19764829.8 | 06.03.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019KR02616 | Priority number, date | US201862639174P | 06.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862639174 P | US201916293523 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: US201916293523 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019172657 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746907 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3746907 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/242, G06F16/2453, G06F16/332, G06F16/33, G10L15/22, G06F3/16, G06N5/04, G10L15/32 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N5/02 (US);
G06N5/04 (EP,US);
G10L15/1815 (US);
G10L15/22 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | G06F16/242, G06F16/2453, G06F16/332, G06F16/33, G10L15/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICH DYNAMISCH ENTWICKELNDES HYBRIDES PERSONALISIERTES SYSTEM DER KÜNSTLICHEN INTELLIGENZ | [2020/50] | English: | DYNAMICALLY EVOLVING HYBRID PERSONALIZED ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE SYSTEM | [2020/50] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE PERSONNALISÉ HYBRIDE À ÉVOLUTION DYNAMIQUE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.07.2023 | 17.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 19.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015006166 (SCHMIDT ERIC RANDELL [US]) [X] 1,7,15 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0061] *; | [XI]US2015120296 (STERN BENJAMIN J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,15 * the whole document * [I] 6,13,14; | [A]WO2016054230 (XBRAIN INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 ** paragraph [0015] - paragraph [00101] *; | [XI]US9721386 (WORLEY III WILLIAM SPENCER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10-12,15 * figures 6-9, 13 * * column 11, line 11 - column 14, line 54 * * column 16, line 44 - column 17, line 16 * [I] 3,6,9,13,14 | International search | [A]US2010241646 (FRIEDMAN ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0050] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2013138440 (STROPE BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0032]-[0063] and figure 2. *; | [Y]US2015006166 (SCHMIDT ERIC RANDELL [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0023], [0058] and claims 8-9. *; | [Y]US2017177710 (BURLIK VOLODIMIR [NL]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0069], [0083]. *; | [A]WO2017197018 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0057]-[0062] and figure 4. * | by applicant | US2015006166 | US2015120296 | US9721386 |