EP3843566 - A RESONANT CIRCUIT FOR AN AEROSOL GENERATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORUS, Anton c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
MOLONEY, Patrick c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 03 /
ABI AOUN, Walid c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 04 /
MILLIGAN, Terrence 5407 Fen Oak Drive Madison, Wisconsin 53718 / US | 05 /
BLANDINO, Thomas Paul 5407 Fen Oak Drive Madison, Wisconsin 53718 / US | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Philip Mark, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19769311.2 | 30.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019US49076 | Priority number, date | GB20180014202 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: GB 201814202 | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020047417 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843566 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3843566 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, H05B6/10 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
H05B6/108 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A24F40/465 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A24F40/30 (EP,IL);
A24F40/50 (EP,IL,KR);
A24F40/53 (US);
A24F40/57 (US);
H05B1/0202 (KR);
H05B6/06 (KR);
H05B6/105 (KR);
H05B6/36 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESONANZKREIS FÜR EIN AEROSOLERZEUGENDES SYSTEM | [2021/27] | English: | A RESONANT CIRCUIT FOR AN AEROSOL GENERATING SYSTEM | [2021/27] | French: | CIRCUIT RÉSONNANT POUR UN SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 31.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.07.2022 | AT | 13.07.2022 | CY | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | NL | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | IE | 30.08.2022 | LU | 30.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2023/42] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 30.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 30.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 30.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 30.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 30.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 30.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 30.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 13.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]ITRM20120193 (PRENDI ELTON) [X] 1-7,9,10,14-17,19,21,22,24 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2015157756 (DUFFIELD PAUL [GB], et al) [A] 8* paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]WO2015177043 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [Y] 22,24 * page 14, line 20 - line 21 *; | [Y]WO2015177256 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [Y] 23 * page 24, line 12 *; | [Y]WO2017085242 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [Y] 26-28,31,32,35 * page 19, line 10 - line 14; figure 3 * * page 28, line 14 - line 16 *; | [XAYI]WO2018073376 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO INVESTMENTS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-6,15,16,19-21,25,29,30,36 * page 12, line 6 - line 16; figures 1,3,5; claims 1,5 * * page 5, line 1 - line 2 * [A] 11-13,18 [Y] 22-24,26-28,31-35 [I] 8; | [Y]US2018214645 (REEVELL TONY [GB]) [Y] 33,34 * paragraphs [0147] , [0151] * | by applicant | WO2016EP70178 |