blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3863951

EP3863951 - REWINDING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SPEED OF THE MOTORS IN A REWINDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.10.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.10.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.07.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.04.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A.CELLI PAPER S.P.A.
Via del Rogio, 17
Tassignano
55012 Capannori (LU) / IT
[2021/33]
Inventor(s)01 / SFORZI, Franco
c/o A.Celli Paper S.p.A. Via del Rogio, 17 - Loc.
Tassignano
55012 Capannori (LU) / IT
 [2021/33]
Representative(s)Mannucci, Michele, et al
Ufficio Tecnico
Ing. A. Mannucci S.r.l.
Via della Scala, 4
50123 Firenze / IT
[2021/33]
Application number, filing date19795649.303.10.2019
[2021/33]
WO2019IB58419
Priority number, dateIT2018000923608.10.2018         Original published format: IT201800009236
[2021/33]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020075018
Date:16.04.2020
Language:EN
[2020/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3863951
Date:18.08.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3863951
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:B65H23/18
[2021/33]
CPC:
B65H23/1806 (EP,US); B65H2301/41485 (EP,US); B65H2513/11 (EP,US);
B65H2515/31 (EP,US); B65H2553/21 (EP); B65H2557/264 (EP);
B65H2701/1924 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
B65H2513/11, B65H2220/02 (EP);
B65H2515/31, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/33]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:UMWICKELMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER DREHZAHL DER MOTOREN IN EINER UMWICKELMASCHINE[2021/33]
English:REWINDING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SPEED OF THE MOTORS IN A REWINDING MACHINE[2021/33]
French:MACHINE DE REMBOBINAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE LA VITESSE DES MOTEURS DANS UNE MACHINE DE REMBOBINAGE[2021/33]
Entry into regional phase07.04.2021National basic fee paid 
07.04.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.04.2021Examination requested  [2021/33]
07.04.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.03.2022Observations by third parties
26.04.2022Observations by third parties
10.10.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.04.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2024Fee for grant paid
12.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0057523  (LUND ARNOLD M [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 1, lines 1-19 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 26 * * page 8, lines 14-30 * * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 14 * * page 11, line 4 - page 13, line 24 * * page 14, line 11 - page 16, line 15 ** figure 2 *;
 [A]US5657941  (SIMONS ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 61 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 15 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2004108403  (UEYAMA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 8 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2012001211  (METSO PAPER INC [FI], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, lines 4-22 * * page 6, lines 3-26 * * page 7, lines 13-18 * * figure 1 *
ExaminationEP0367901
 JPH09172795
 ITFI20010197
 US2005253013
 US2006038051
    - Benjamin A. Thorp ET AL, "Web Control", Pulp and paper manufacture 3rd Edition Volume 7 Paper Machine Operations, Joint Textbook Committee of the Paper Industry, (19970101), pages 390 - 393, XP055922254
otherEP0367901
 JPH09172795
 ITFI20010197
 US2005253013
 US2006038051
    - "Web Control", Benjamin A. Thorp, Michael J. Kocurek, Pulp and paper manufacture 3rd Edition Volume 7 Paper Machine Operations, Joint Textbook Committee of the Paper Industry, (19970101), pages 390 - 393, XP055922254
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.