EP3847517 - METHOD AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PRODUCT AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/28] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A PRODUCT, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | ||
[2022/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIATSA, Athina Konrad-Groß Straße 12 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
MITTERMEIER, Thomas Brosamerstrasse 7 90459 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
OCHSENFELD, Henning Witzlebenstraße 70 90491 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
PETTIGREW, Liam 1/16 Sadlier Crescent Petersham, NSW 204 / AU | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19801723.8 | 30.10.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019EP79624 | Priority number, date | EP20180211722 | 11.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18211722 | [2021/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020119999 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3847517 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3847517 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, G05B13/02, G03F7/20 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
G05B19/41875 (EP,US);
G05B13/0265 (US);
G05B13/027 (EP);
G05B2219/32193 (EP);
G05B2219/32368 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PRODUKTS SOWIE COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2021/28] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PRODUCT AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT AINSI QUE PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/28] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A PRODUCT, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | ||
Former [2021/28] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT AINSI QUE PRODUIT-PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 06.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2019 | AL | 14.09.2022 | BG | 14.09.2022 | CY | 14.09.2022 | CZ | 14.09.2022 | DK | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | ES | 14.09.2022 | FI | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | MK | 14.09.2022 | MT | 14.09.2022 | NL | 14.09.2022 | PL | 14.09.2022 | RO | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SE | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | IE | 30.10.2022 | LU | 30.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | NO | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | PT | 16.01.2023 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 30.10.2019 | |
AL | 14.09.2022 | ||
BG | 14.09.2022 | ||
CY | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
MK | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 30.10.2019 | |
AL | 14.09.2022 | ||
CY | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
MK | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 30.10.2019 | |
AL | 14.09.2022 | ||
CY | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CY | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003150909 (MARKHAM CHARLES EARL [US], et al) [A] 2* paragraph [0146] *; | [A]US2014064445 (ADLER DAVID LEWIS [US]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0237] - paragraph [0283] *; | [A]US2017123411 (CHENG KUANG-HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0055] *; | [A]WO2018150210 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] *; | [A]US2018284091 (LEVANON IDO [IL]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]US2018292812 (BASEMAN ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 6 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0063] *; | [A]US2018307203 (AIZAWA NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0002]; claims 5-6 * | by applicant | US2003150909 | US2014064445 | US2017123411 | WO2018150210 | US2018284091 | US2018292812 | US2018307203 |