blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3822671

EP3822671 - OPTICAL WAVELENGTH CONVERSION MEMBER AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.04.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Niterra Co., Ltd.
1-1-1, Higashisakura
Higashi-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-0005 / JP
[2023/36]
Former [2021/20]For all designated states
NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAKU, Shohei
c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
02 / KATSU, Yusuke
c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
03 / ITO, Tsuneyuki
c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
04 / KURAHASHI, Toshiaki
c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
05 / YAMADA, Hideto
c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
 [2021/20]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2021/20]
Application number, filing date19834873.201.07.2019
[2021/20]
WO2019JP26188
Priority number, dateJP2018013154411.07.2018         Original published format: JP 2018131544
[2021/20]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020013016
Date:16.01.2020
Language:JA
[2020/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3822671
Date:19.05.2021
Language:EN
[2021/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3822671
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.01.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2022
ClassificationIPC:C09K11/77, H01L33/50, C04B35/117, G02B5/20, G02B1/02
[2024/02]
CPC:
C09K11/7774 (EP,US); G02B5/206 (EP,KR); C09K11/02 (US);
C04B35/117 (EP,KR,US); C09K11/7766 (KR); F21V9/30 (US);
G02B1/02 (EP,KR); H01L33/501 (KR); H01L33/502 (EP);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US); C04B2235/3222 (US); C04B2235/3224 (EP);
C04B2235/3225 (EP); C04B2235/3229 (EP); C04B2235/3286 (EP);
C04B2235/5436 (EP); C04B2235/5445 (EP); C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/661 (EP); C04B2235/75 (EP); C04B2235/77 (EP);
C04B2235/80 (EP); C04B2235/95 (EP); C04B2235/9646 (EP);
F21Y2115/30 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2022/16]C09K11/80, H01L33/50, C04B35/117, G02B5/20, G02B1/02
Former IPC [2021/20]G02B5/20, C04B35/117, C04B35/44, C09K11/08, C09K11/80, H01L33/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTISCHES WELLENLÄNGENUMWANDLUNGSELEMENT UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG[2021/20]
English:OPTICAL WAVELENGTH CONVERSION MEMBER AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE[2021/20]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE CONVERSION DE LONGUEUR D'ONDE OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT[2021/20]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2021Translation filed 
11.01.2021National basic fee paid 
11.01.2021Search fee paid 
11.01.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2021Examination requested  [2021/20]
10.06.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2024Fee for grant paid
26.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2015329778  (MENKE YVONNE [DE], et al) [X] 1-3* paragraphs [0125] - [0129]; claims 1,3; table 2 *;
 [X]WO2016075014  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3 * page 22, line 33 - page 23, line 20 * * page 21 *;
 [X]WO2018079421  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * example -; table 1 *
International search[A]JP2005105177  (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-3* , paragraphs [0001], [0034] (Family: none) *;
 [X]WO2011125422  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0001], [0081]-[0090] & US 2013/0088143 A1, paragraphs [0001], [0093]-[0101] & EP 2554627 A1 & CN 102947417 A & KR 10-2012-0132575 A *;
 [X]JP2016509103  (SCHOTT AG) [X] 1-3 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0005], [0108]-[0112] & US 2015/0329778 A1, claim 1, paragraphs [0002], [0125]-[0130] & JP 2017-197774 A & WO 2014/114473 A1 & DE 102013100832 A1 & CN 104968630 A & KR 10-2015-0113132 A *;
 [X]JP2017536664  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.) [X] 1-3 * , claim 1, paragraph [0072] & US 2017/0315433 A1, claim 1, paragraph [0074] & WO 2016/075014 A1 & EP 3224674 A1 & CN 107002978 A & KR 10-2017-0084212 A *;
 [X]WO2018079421  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0075]-[0092], claims & JP 2018-70431 A & JP 2019-28306 A & JP 2018-77463 A & JP 2018-188612 A & WO 2018/079373 A1 & WO 2018/079419 A1 & WO 2018/079501 A1 & WO 2018/079373 A1 & KR 10-2019-0053240 A & KR 10-2019-0031531 A & KR 10-2019-0041022 A & CN 109716178 A & KR 10-2019-004707 A *;
 [X]WO2018079501  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0084], [0111]-[0114], claims & JP 2018-70431 A & JP 2018-188612 A & JP 2018-77463 A & WO 2018/079373 A1 & WO 2018/079419 A1 & WO 2018/079421 A1 & WO 2018/079373 A1 & KR 10-2019-0047078 A & KR 10-2019-0031531 A & KR 10-2019-0041022 A & CN 109716178 A & KR 10-2019-0053240 A *;
 [X]JP2018514895  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.) [X] 1-3 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0052]-[0053], [0056], fig. 3 & US 2018/0026165 A1, claim 1, paragraphs [0058]-[0059], [0062], fig. 3 & WO 2016/134995 A1 & EP 3262696 A1 & CN 107251244 A & KR 10-2017-0122780 A *
by applicantWO2004065324
 JP2014132084
 JP2018131544
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.