blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3820735

EP3820735 - A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE LIGHTING DEVICE, A CONTROL DEVICE, A VEHICLE LIGHTING DEVICE, A VEHICLE, A COMPUTER PROGRAM AND A COMPUTER- READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.04.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 14.02.2024  [2024/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scania CV AB
151 87 Södertälje / SE
[2021/20]
Inventor(s)01 / CLAESSON, André
Sågstuguvägen 19
146 38 Tullinge / SE
02 / TEPPOLA, Sami
Fruktvägen 50
155 31 Nykvarn / SE
03 / KALLIO, Mikko
Nyhemsvägen 11
153 71 Hölö / SE
04 / SKEPPSTRÖM, Tomas
Bränningestrandsvägen 44
151 39 Södertälje / SE
05 / COLLING, Morgan
Lämbonäsvägen 54
153 94 Hölö / SE
06 / ÄHRLIG, Linus
Stenvägen 22
137 37 Västerhaninge / SE
07 / SJÖDIN, Robert
Skogvaktarvägen 11
611 44 Nyköping / SE
 [2021/20]
Representative(s)Scania CV AB
Patents, GP 117kv
151 87 Södertälje / SE
[2021/20]
Application number, filing date19835033.205.07.2019
[2021/20]
WO2019SE50671
Priority number, dateSE2018005087510.07.2018         Original published format: SE 1850875
[2021/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020013754
Date:16.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3820735
Date:19.05.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3820735
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE16.01.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2022
ClassificationIPC:B60Q1/00, B62D35/00, B62D63/02, B60Q1/14, B60Q1/26, B60Q1/50, B60Q1/52
[2022/13]
CPC:
B60Q1/0035 (EP,US); B60Q1/00 (SE); B60Q1/1407 (EP,US);
B60Q1/2607 (EP,US); B60Q1/34 (US); B60Q1/44 (US);
B60Q1/503 (US); B60Q1/5035 (SE); B60Q1/5037 (EP,US);
B60Q1/507 (EP,US); B60Q1/508 (EP,US); B60Q1/525 (EP,US);
B60Q1/545 (EP,US); B62D35/00 (US); G08G1/0967 (US);
B60Q1/30 (EP,US); B60Q2300/47 (EP); B60Q2400/10 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2021/20]B60Q1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER FAHRZEUGBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERVORRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUGBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUG, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM[2021/20]
English:A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE LIGHTING DEVICE, A CONTROL DEVICE, A VEHICLE LIGHTING DEVICE, A VEHICLE, A COMPUTER PROGRAM AND A COMPUTER- READABLE MEDIUM[2021/20]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE DE VÉHICULE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE DE VÉHICULE, VÉHICULE, PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR[2021/20]
Entry into regional phase10.02.2021National basic fee paid 
10.02.2021Search fee paid 
10.02.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2021Examination requested  [2021/20]
22.09.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2024Fee for grant paid
05.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009026797  (WOOD RICHARD [US]) [Y] 6,10* figures 1-15; claim 1 *;
 [XY]US2017120804  (KENTLEY TIMOTHY DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-17 * paragraphs [0102] , [0131] - [0142] - [0175] , [0190] - [0194]; figures 1-24 * [Y] 6,10,18;
 [XY]WO2017073248  (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-17 * figures 1-16 * [Y] 6,10,18;
 [Y]DE102016209099  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 18 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [Y]BE1024431  (BRINGLOE BENJAMIN [BE]) [Y] 6,10 * page 12, lines 5-26; figures 1-6 *;
 [P]EP3369616  (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0087] , [0151] - [0155] - [0182] - [0196]; figures 1-16 *
International search[A]US2015043231  (CLARK JOHN T [US]) [A] 1, 10, 11, 23 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0044]-[0047], [0080]; figures 1A-1 F,60 *;
 [A]US2016264043  (SCHLOESSER MARTIN [US]) [A] 1, 11, 23* ; abstract; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]DE102015007609  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1, 11, 23 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0021]-[0023]; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US2017240098  (SWEENEY MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 11-14, 21- 24, 27 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0013]-[0015], [0080]-[0085]; figure 4A *;
 [X]US2018173237  (REILEY CAROL [US], et al) [X] 1, 4-11, 14-27 * ; paragraphs [0009]-[0035], [0056]-[0064]; figures 1,3,5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.