blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3825682

EP3825682 - HERPESVIRUS MEASURING METHOD AND HERPES VIRUS MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2021/21]VIRUS MEASURING METHOD, VIRUS MEASURING DEVICE, VIRUS DETERMINING PROGRAM, STRESS DETERMINING METHOD, AND STRESS DETERMINING DEVICE
[2023/13]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.03.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.04.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE, ES, SK
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Osaka University
1-1, Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
[2021/21]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIDA Kohji
c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
02 / HASHIDA Noriyasu
c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
03 / TANIGUCHI Masateru
c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
04 / TSUTSUI Makusu
c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
 [2021/21]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB
Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2021/21]
Application number, filing date19837472.018.07.2019
[2021/21]
WO2019JP28356
Priority number, dateJP2018013596119.07.2018         Original published format: JP 2018135961
[2021/21]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020017608
Date:23.01.2020
Language:JA
[2020/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3825682
Date:26.05.2021
Language:EN
[2021/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3825682
Date:16.08.2023
Language:EN
[2023/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.01.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2021
ClassificationIPC:G01N27/00, G01N27/447, G01N33/50, G01N15/10, G01N33/487
[2021/34]
CPC:
G01N27/3278 (EP,US); A61B5/16 (EP); A61B5/7235 (EP);
G01N15/1031 (EP); G01N27/447 (EP,US); G01N33/48721 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (US); G01N2015/1024 (EP); G01N2015/1028 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2021/21]G01N27/00, A61B5/16, G01N27/447, G01N33/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERPESVIRUSMESSVERFAHREN UND HERPESVIRUSMESSVORRICHTUNG[2023/13]
English:HERPESVIRUS MEASURING METHOD AND HERPES VIRUS MEASURING DEVICE[2023/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DU VIRUS DE L'HERPÈS ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DU VIRUS DE L'HERPÈS[2023/13]
Former [2021/21]VIRUSMESSVERFAHREN, VIRUSMESSVORRICHTUNG, VIRUSBESTIMMUNGSPROGRAMM, STRESSBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND STRESSBESTIMMUNGSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2021/21]VIRUS MEASURING METHOD, VIRUS MEASURING DEVICE, VIRUS DETERMINING PROGRAM, STRESS DETERMINING METHOD, AND STRESS DETERMINING DEVICE
Former [2021/21]PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE VIRUS, DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE VIRUS, PROGRAMME DE DÉTERMINATION DE VIRUS, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE STRESS ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE STRESS
Entry into regional phase19.01.2021Translation filed 
19.01.2021National basic fee paid 
19.01.2021Search fee paid 
19.01.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.2021Examination requested  [2021/21]
17.02.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2023Fee for grant paid
10.07.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.07.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
07.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.08.2023
CZ16.08.2023
DK16.08.2023
EE16.08.2023
ES16.08.2023
FI16.08.2023
HR16.08.2023
LT16.08.2023
LV16.08.2023
NL16.08.2023
PL16.08.2023
RO16.08.2023
RS16.08.2023
SE16.08.2023
SK16.08.2023
SM16.08.2023
NO16.11.2023
GR17.11.2023
IS16.12.2023
PT18.12.2023
[2024/23]
Former [2024/22]AT16.08.2023
CZ16.08.2023
DK16.08.2023
FI16.08.2023
HR16.08.2023
LT16.08.2023
LV16.08.2023
NL16.08.2023
PL16.08.2023
RO16.08.2023
RS16.08.2023
SE16.08.2023
SM16.08.2023
NO16.11.2023
GR17.11.2023
IS16.12.2023
PT18.12.2023
Former [2024/20]AT16.08.2023
FI16.08.2023
HR16.08.2023
LT16.08.2023
LV16.08.2023
NL16.08.2023
PL16.08.2023
RS16.08.2023
SE16.08.2023
SM16.08.2023
NO16.11.2023
GR17.11.2023
IS16.12.2023
PT18.12.2023
Former [2024/10]AT16.08.2023
FI16.08.2023
HR16.08.2023
LT16.08.2023
LV16.08.2023
NL16.08.2023
PL16.08.2023
RS16.08.2023
SE16.08.2023
NO16.11.2023
GR17.11.2023
IS16.12.2023
PT18.12.2023
Former [2024/09]AT16.08.2023
FI16.08.2023
LT16.08.2023
NL16.08.2023
SE16.08.2023
NO16.11.2023
GR17.11.2023
IS16.12.2023
Former [2024/08]LT16.08.2023
NL16.08.2023
NO16.11.2023
GR17.11.2023
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2008280283  (KONDO KAZUHIRO [JP]) [Y] 12-18* paragraphs [0002] , [00 9] , [0 19] *;
 [XYI]WO2018067878  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1,3,6,8,11 * paragraphs [0214] , [ 260] , [ 287] , [ 290] , [ 201] * [Y] 12-18 [I] 5,9,10;
 [XI]WO2018081178  (TWO PORE GUYS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,11 * paragraphs [0108] - [0109] - [ 127] , [ 185] - [0187]; figure 1A * [I] 4,9,10;
 [XI]WO2018110540  (UNIV OSAKA [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,11 * figures 2, 4 * [I] 4,9;
 EP3557225  [ ] (UNIV OSAKA [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0001] , [0 10] , [0 11]; figures 2, 4 *
International search[Y]JP2007330263  (VIRUS IKAGAKU KENKYUSHO INC) [Y] 3-6, 12-18 * , claim 1 & US 2008/0280283 A1, claim 1 & WO 2006/006634 A1 *;
 [Y]JP2009072313  (DOSHISHA, et al) [Y] 9-10 * , paragraph [0021] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2017156168  (UNIV OSAKA, et al) [Y] 7-11, 16-18 * , paragraphs [0015], [0021], [0037], fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]WO2017170572  (UNIV OSAKA [JP]) [Y] 4-6, 8-10, 15 * , paragraph [0010] & US 2019/0119747 A1, paragraph [0013] & EP 3438281 A1 *;
 [A]WO2017183716  (UNIV OSAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2019/0128888 A1 *;
 [A]US2018155768  (COHEN THOMAS L [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * , entire text, all drawings & WO 2016/196625 A1 & EP 3303620 A1 *;
 [Y]WO2018110540  (UNIV OSAKA [JP]) [Y] 7-11, 13-15, 17-18 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0038]-[0042], fig. 54 & EP 3396354 A1, claim 1 & CN 108474726 A *;
 [XY]  - TSUTSUI, MAKUSU et al., "Identifying single influenza virus using solid-state nanopores", Lecture preprints of the 78th JSAP Autumn Meeting, (20170825), pages 1 - 1, XP055676473 [X] 1-2 [Y] 3-18
 [A]  - Masateru Taniguchi, Takashi Washio, Tomoji Kawai, "19p-D102-3 Integration of Single-Molecule Analysis Methods with Machine Learning", 65th JSAP Spring Meeting, Japan Society of Applied Physics; Tokyo, March 17-20, 2018, (20180305), ISBN 978-4-86348-661-4, XP009525366 [A] 1-18
 [A]  - TSUTSUI, MAKUSU et al., "Identification of Individual Bacterial Cells through the Intermolecular Interactions with Peptide- Functionalized Solid-State Pores", analytical chemistry, (20180119), vol. 90, no. 3, doi:10.1021/acs.analchem.7b04950, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 1511 - 1515, XP055676487 [A] 1-18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.7b04950
 [A]  - TSUTSUI, MAKUSU et al., "Discriminating single- bacterial shape using low-aspect-ratio pores", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20170101), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/s41598-017-17443-6, ISSN 2045-2322, pages 1 - 9, XP055676490 [A] 1-18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-017-17443-6
 [A]  - TSUTSUI, MAKUSU et al., "Particle Trajectory- Dependent Ionic Current Blockade in Low-Aspect- Ratio Pores", ACS NANO, (20151207), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1021/acsnano.5b05906, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 803 - 809, XP055676494 [A] 1-18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsnano.5b05906
 [PX]  - Arima, Akihide; Tsutsui, Makusu; Tonomura, Wataru; Yokota, Kazumichi, "18a-222-6 Identification single viruses using nanopore sensors", Preprints 79th JSAP Autumn Meeting, Japan Society of Applied Physics; Nagoya, 18-21 September 2018, (20180905), vol. 79, page 11-028, XP009525367 [PX] 1-11
by applicantJP2000275248
 WO2006006634
 JP2012047735
 WO2013137209
 JP2018517757
    - KESSLER RCANDREWS GCOLPE LJ et al., "Short screening scales to monitor population prevalances and trends in non-specific psychological distress", Psychological Medicine, (20020000), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 959 - 76
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.