blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3907076

EP3907076 - TRANSPARENT LAYERED FILM, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF TRANSPARENT LAYERED FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.08.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.03.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.10.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.07.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.03.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 06.03.2024  [2024/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd.
No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd.
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100015 / CN
[2021/45]
Inventor(s)01 / GU, Penghao
No. 9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Jiahao
No. 9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
03 / TSAI, Pao Ming
No. 9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
 [2024/10]
Former [2021/45]01 / GU, Penghao
Beijing 100176 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Jiahao
Beijing 100176 / CN
03 / TSAI, Pao Ming
Beijing 100176 / CN
Representative(s)Brötz, Helmut, et al
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Yale-Allee 26
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[2021/45]
Application number, filing date19861236.803.01.2019
[2021/45]
WO2019CN70244
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020140233
Date:09.07.2020
Language:ZH
[2020/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3907076
Date:10.11.2021
Language:EN
[2021/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3907076
Date:06.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN09.07.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2022
ClassificationIPC:B32B27/08, B32B7/023, B32B27/28, B32B37/10, G06F1/16
[2023/33]
CPC:
G02B1/14 (EP,US); G06F1/1607 (US); B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/281 (EP,US); B32B3/06 (EP); B32B37/06 (US);
B32B7/022 (EP,US); B32B7/023 (EP,US); B32B7/027 (EP);
G06F1/1637 (EP); B32B2250/03 (EP,US); B32B2250/04 (EP);
B32B2250/05 (EP); B32B2250/24 (EP,US); B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP); B32B2255/20 (EP); B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/42 (EP,US); B32B2307/51 (EP,US); B32B2307/536 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US); B32B2307/584 (EP); B32B2457/20 (EP);
B32B2457/206 (EP,US); B32B2457/208 (EP,US); B32B37/10 (EP);
G02B5/3033 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2022/33]B32B27/08, B32B7/023, B32B27/28, B32B33/00, B32B37/10, G06F1/16
Former IPC [2021/45]B32B27/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRANSPARENTER SCHICHTFILM, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN TRANSPARENTEN SCHICHTFILM[2021/45]
English:TRANSPARENT LAYERED FILM, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF TRANSPARENT LAYERED FILM[2021/45]
French:FILM STRATIFIÉ TRANSPARENT, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FILM STRATIFIÉ TRANSPARENT[2021/45]
Entry into regional phase23.03.2020Translation filed 
23.03.2020National basic fee paid 
23.03.2020Search fee paid 
23.03.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2020Examination requested  [2021/45]
01.02.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2023Fee for grant paid
01.12.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.12.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2017214105  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,8-10,12 * figures 4, 8 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0 27] , [0 38] , [0 45] , [0 52] , [0 84] - [0088] * [Y] 11 [I] 3-6;
 [XYI]WO2018102607  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,8-10,12 * figures 3A-3C, 7 * * page 1, line 20 - line 27 * * page 10, line 9 - page 13, line 15 * * page 18, line 22 - page 19, line 12 * [Y] 11 [I] 3-5;
 [Y]CN207541602U  (NANCHANG O FILM TECH CO LTD) [Y] 11* claims 1, 5, 7, 8 *;
 [XI]CN208210430U  (SHENGYI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,13,14 * claims 1-4 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0 28] , [0 37] , [0 38] * [I] 3-6,15
International search[A]JP2007098905  (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0005] and [0007] *;
 [A]CN101441282  (TORAY SAEHAN INC [KR]) [A] 1-21 * description, page 2, paragraph 3 to page 3, paragraph 4 *;
 [A]JP6265902B  (MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.) [A] 1-21* claims 1-5 *;
 [A]CN207541602U  (NANCHANG O FILM TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0018]-[0022] and [0025] *;
 [A]CN108461519  (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0017] *;
 [A]CN108877529  (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0005]-[0020] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.