blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3716322

EP3716322 - POWER SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE PACKAGE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.08.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  04.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.07.2022  [2022/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lee, Min Hee
(Yujeong Villa, Seonhak-dong)
B02, 38-20, Neommal-ro 29beon-gil
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon
21909 / KR
[2020/40]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Jeong Hwa
(Dong-a Apt
Galsan-dong)
1dong 1305ho
42, Garwoldong-ro, Bupyeong-gu
Incheon 21336 / KR
02 / LEE, Min Hee
(Yujeong Villa
Seonhak-dong)
B02
38-20, Neommal-ro 29beon-gil, Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 21909 / KR
 [2020/40]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[2020/40]
Application number, filing date19877527.209.09.2019
[2020/40]
WO2019KR11612
Priority number, dateKR2019001071828.01.2019         Original published format: KR 20190010718
[2020/40]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020159031
Date:06.08.2020
Language:KO
[2020/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3716322
Date:30.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.08.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2021
ClassificationIPC:H01L23/373, H01L23/13, H01L23/48, H01L23/29, H01L23/367, H01L21/48, H01L23/055, H01L23/15, H01L25/07
[2021/33]
CPC:
H01L23/051 (EP); H01L23/3735 (KR); H01L21/486 (EP);
H01L21/4867 (EP); H01L23/13 (EP,KR); H01L23/15 (EP);
H01L23/29 (KR); H01L23/367 (KR); H01L23/3731 (EP);
H01L23/3736 (KR); H01L23/481 (KR); H01L23/49822 (EP);
H01L23/49833 (EP); H01L25/072 (EP); H01L25/18 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/40]H01L23/373, H01L23/13, H01L23/48, H01L23/29, H01L23/367
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/40]
TitleGerman:GEHÄUSE FÜR LEISTUNGSHALBLEITERMODUL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2020/40]
English:POWER SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE PACKAGE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF SAME[2020/40]
French:BOÎTIER DE MODULE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE PUISSANCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2020/40]
Entry into regional phase04.05.2020Translation filed 
04.05.2020National basic fee paid 
04.05.2020Search fee paid 
04.05.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2020Examination requested  [2020/40]
16.02.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/30]
08.03.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2022/30]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.202103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2018030486  (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [AP]EP3499559  (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0159] , [0187] *;
 [A]EP2244288  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2010069620  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]JP2010073712  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] *;
 [A]JP2007048798  (SUMITOMO METAL ELECTRONICS DEV) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
International search[A]KR20100114076  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0121]-[0128] and figures 1-5. *;
 [A]JP2011049552  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0045]-[0051] and figure 2. *;
 [A]KR20140012680  (NODA SCREEN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]KR20080029908  (TDK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]JP2016111352  (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. *;
 [PX]KR101979265B  (LEE MIN HEE [KR]) [PX] 1-10 * See the entire document. ** The above document is the published document for the earlier application that serves as the basis for claiming priority of the present international application. *
by applicantKR20090010166
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.