blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3888242

EP3888242 - MOBILE PANEL CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.10.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.09.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.06.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Steam Tech, LLC
1600 Broadway Suite 1600
Denver, CO 80202 / US
[2021/40]
Inventor(s)01 / HARTMAN, Philip J.
1228 Fairfield Avenue
Windsor, CO 80550 / US
02 / HARTMAN, James L.
5232 Glade Road
Loveland, CO 80538 / US
 [2021/40]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner Part mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[2024/13]
Former [2021/40]Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date19889445.327.11.2019
[2021/40]
WO2019US63754
Priority number, dateUS201862771755P27.11.2018         Original published format: US 201862771755 P
US20191669495425.11.2019         Original published format: US201916694954
[2021/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020113105
Date:04.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3888242
Date:06.10.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3888242
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.06.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2022
ClassificationIPC:B08B1/00, B08B5/02, B08B7/02, F24S40/20, H02S40/10
[2023/42]
CPC:
H02S40/10 (EP,KR); B08B7/04 (KR,US); B08B1/12 (KR,US);
B08B1/30 (EP,KR); B08B3/10 (KR,US); B08B5/02 (EP,KR,US);
B08B7/02 (EP,KR); F24S40/20 (EP,KR); G01S19/13 (KR,US);
G05B19/048 (KR,US); H02S20/32 (KR); B08B2203/007 (KR,US);
G05B2219/32234 (EP,KR,US); G05B2219/45078 (EP,KR); G05B2219/45082 (EP,KR);
H02S99/00 (US); Y02E10/40 (EP,KR); Y02E10/50 (EP,KR) (-)
Former IPC [2022/35]H02S40/10, B08B1/00, B08B3/00, B08B3/02, H02S40/12, F24S40/20
Former IPC [2021/40]H02S40/10, B08B1/00, B08B3/00, B08B3/02, H02S40/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/40]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMA25.06.2021
TN25.06.2021
TitleGerman:MOBILER PLATTENREINIGER[2021/40]
English:MOBILE PANEL CLEANER[2021/40]
French:NETTOYEUR DE PANNEAU MOBILE[2021/40]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2021National basic fee paid 
25.06.2021Search fee paid 
25.06.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2021Examination requested  [2021/40]
23.02.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2024Fee for grant paid
21.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US8726458  (MAHR SCOTT REINHOLD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - line 16 * * column 4, line 30 - column 8, line 20 * * claim - * * figure - * [I] 4,9,13;
 [XI]WO2018083598  (SNOLAR TECH LTD [CA]) [X] 1,2,5-12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0147] * * claim - * * figure - * [I] 13;
 [A]US2018311822  (KAMINKA GAL [IL], et al) [A] 1,3-8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0285] - paragraph [0286] * * claim - ** figure - *
International search[Y]US2011126378  (OTA HIDEAKI [JP]) [Y] 12, 13 * entire document *;
 [A]WO2014001906  (ECOPPIA SCIENT LTD [IL]) [A] 1-24* entire document *;
 [Y]WO2016197013  (IYER JAGADISH [US]) [Y] 20 * entire document *;
 [XY]US2017093330  (CASTELLUCCI DEVIN CAMERON [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-11, 14-16, 18, 19, 21, 22 * entire document * [Y] 12, 13, 17, 20;
 [Y]CN108832882  (SUZHOU FEIMI PHOTOELECTRICITY CO LTD) [Y] 17 * entire document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.