blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3670061

EP3670061 - HYBRID ELECTROSLAG CLADDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2022
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.01.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2025New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lincoln Global, Inc.
9160 Norwalk Boulevard
Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670 / US
[2020/26]
Inventor(s)01 / NATHEGI, Amin
An den Emscherauen 96
44263 Dortmund / DE
02 / BOLTE, Frank
Im Beiseling 10
45307 Essen / DE
03 / POLLMANN, Roland
Birkenhang 42
42555 Velbert / DE
04 / THUME, Christopher
Im Tückwinkel 26
58636 Iserlohn / DE
05 / GOLDING, Mark S.
10 Greanles Close
Yateley, Hampshire GU46 7SL / GB
06 / ZHANG, Zhuyao
21 Coresbrook Way
Knaphill Woking Surrey GU21 2TR / GB
07 / CHATTOPADHYAY, Pallav
Dondertstraße 16
47623 Kevelaer / DE
 [2020/26]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus
Renteilichtung 1
45134 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/26]Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date20150575.726.11.2015
[2020/26]
Priority number, dateDE20152004355U19.06.2015         Original published format: DE 202015004355 U
DE20152007709U10.11.2015         Original published format: DE 202015007709 U
[2020/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3670061
Date:24.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2020
ClassificationIPC:B23K25/00, B23K35/02
[2020/26]
CPC:
B23K25/005 (EP,CN,KR,US); B23K35/30 (EP,CN); B23K35/0255 (EP,CN);
B23K35/0261 (EP,CN,US); B23K35/0266 (EP,CN,KR,US); B23K35/3033 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23K35/3066 (EP,CN,KR); B23K35/308 (EP,CN); B23K35/3086 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C19/03 (EP,CN); C22C19/05 (EP,CN); C22C19/055 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C19/058 (EP,CN,KR); C22C38/002 (EP,US); C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US); C22C38/06 (EP,US); C22C38/40 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/42 (EP,US); C22C38/44 (EP,CN,KR,US); C22C38/48 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US); C22C38/58 (EP,CN,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/07]
Former [2020/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HYBRIDE ELEKTROSCHLACKENVERKLEIDUNG[2020/26]
English:HYBRID ELECTROSLAG CLADDING[2020/26]
French:REVÊTEMENT HYBRIDE SOUS LAITIER[2020/26]
Examination procedure11.01.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2021Examination requested  [2021/07]
11.01.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.05.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
05.03.2025Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15825945.7  / EP3188873
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
18.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
23.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
26.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2013004674  (GOLDING MARK S [GB]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.