blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3712702

EP3712702 - DISPLAY SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.05.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.03.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.08.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
929 Long Bridge Drive
Arlington, VA 22202 / US
[2023/12]
Former [2020/39]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606 / US
Inventor(s)01 / McINTOSH, Darren Carl
The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, Illinois 60606-1596 / US
 [2020/39]
Representative(s)St Clair Jones, Gregory Arthur Langley, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2020/39]
Application number, filing date20162000.210.03.2020
[2020/39]
Priority number, dateUS20191636233122.03.2019         Original published format: US201916362331
[2020/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3712702
Date:23.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2020
ClassificationIPC:G03B21/60, G03B29/00, G03B21/14, B64D47/02, H04N9/31
[2020/39]
CPC:
G03B29/00 (EP); B64D47/02 (EP,US); G02B27/0101 (US);
G02F1/0126 (US); G02F1/0147 (US); G03B21/142 (EP);
G03B21/60 (EP); H04N9/317 (EP); H04N9/3185 (EP);
H04N9/3194 (EP); B64D43/00 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/17]
Former [2020/39]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2020/39]
English:DISPLAY SYSTEMS AND METHODS[2020/39]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'AFFICHAGE[2020/39]
Examination procedure19.03.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2021Examination requested  [2021/17]
19.03.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.05.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1107052  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0021] - [0022] - [0077]; figures 2,6,7 *;
 [YA]EP2549329  (BOEING CO [US]) [Y] 9,10 * paragraph [0007]; figures 3-7 * [A] 12;
 [YA]EP2565118  (AIRBUS OPERATIONS LTD [GB]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0026]; figure 2 * [A] 12;
 [YA]US8933819  (GARRETTSON BROOK WHIPPLE [US]) [Y] 11,14 * column 10; figures 3-5 * [A] 12;
 [A]US2016257430  (HAYASHI SHOTARO [JP], et al) [A] 9* paragraphs [0038] - [0048]; figures 3,4 *;
 [XY]US2016274447  (GRUNDHOFER ANSELM [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0052]; figures 1,2,7,9 * [Y] 7-11,13,14;
 [YA]WO2016181425  (SHINMAYWA IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 9-11 * figures 1-4 * [A] 12;
 [Y]EP3106392  (GOODRICH LIGHTING SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7,8,10,13 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009]; figures 1, 3, 5 *;
 [X]WO2018119436  (NEWTONOID TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,9 * paragraphs [0034] , [0053]; figure 5 *;
 [X]US2019056650  (DIAO RUI-MIN [CN], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0016] , [0027] - [0028] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.