EP3697092 - IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, AND IMAGE DECODING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVCKENWOOD Corporation 3-12, Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Hiroya c/o JVCKENWOOD Corporation Intellectual Property Department 3-12, Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Motoharu c/o JVCKENWOOD Corporation Intellectual Property Department 3-12, Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 03 /
FUKUSHIMA, Shigeru c/o JVCKENWOOD Corporation Intellectual Property Department 3-12, Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 04 /
KUMAKURA, Toru c/o JVCKENWOOD Corporation Intellectual Property Department 3-12, Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 20168284.6 | 17.03.2014 | [2020/34] | Priority number, date | JP20130074913 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013074913 | JP20130074914 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013074914 | JP20130081796 | 10.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013081796 | JP20130081797 | 10.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013081797 | JP20140023251 | 10.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014023251 | JP20140023252 | 10.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014023252 | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697092 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3697092 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/463, H04N19/593, H04N19/186 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
H04N19/593 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/109 (RU,US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/186 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/463 (EP,US);
H04N19/503 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Title | German: | BILDDECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDDECODIERUNGSPROGRAMM | [2020/34] | English: | IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, AND IMAGE DECODING PROGRAM | [2020/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE ET PROGRAMME DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE | [2020/34] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 18.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14773077.4 / EP2981087 | EP19198669.4 / EP3606074 | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.09.2021 | AT | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | LU | 17.03.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
BG | 29.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012176406 (JVC KENWOOD CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0096]; figures 8,14,15 *; | US2016323574 [ ] (NAKAMURA HIROYA [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0145]; figures 8,14,15 *; | [A] - FLYNN D ET AL, "HEVC Range Extensions Draft 2", 12. JCT-VC MEETING; 103. MPEG MEETING; 14-1-2013 - 23-1-2013; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20130225), no. JCTVC-L1005, XP030113950 [A] 1-3 * page 107; tables 8-2 * |