EP3725698 - HINGED LID BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfäffle GmbH Verpackungswerk August-Wilhelm-Pfäffle-Strasse 4-8 73547 Lorch / DE | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behrens, Detlef Heinrich-Brüning-Str. 34a 46395 Bocholt / DE | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Frey, Sven Holger Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 20169604.4 | 15.04.2020 | [2020/43] | Priority number, date | DE201920102180U | 16.04.2019 Original published format: DE 202019102180 U | [2020/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725698 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D6/18 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
A47B47/042 (EP);
B65D5/00 (EP);
B65D5/32 (EP);
B65D5/321 (EP);
B65D5/4283 (EP);
A47B55/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAPPBOX | [2020/43] | English: | HINGED LID BOX | [2020/43] | French: | BOÎTE PLIANTE | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH10211974 (WATANABE KOGYOSHO KK) [X] 1,3,4,6-9 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 24]; figures 5-7 * [I] 2,5,10,11; | [Y]CN201734202U (KESONG GUO) [Y] 12-14* figures 7-8 *; | [XYI]US2018127139 (PERELLA DANIEL V [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0019] - [0021] - [0026] * [Y] 12-14 [I] 10 |