blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3730067

EP3730067 - RELOAD ASSEMBLY FOR CIRCULAR STAPLING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.04.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.09.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2020/44]
Inventor(s)01 / WILLIAMS, Justin
208 Lantern Park Lane North
Southbury, CT 06488 / US
 [2020/44]
Representative(s)Maschio & Soames IP Ltd
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[2024/08]
Former [2020/44]Maschio, Antonio
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
Application number, filing date20170560.521.04.2020
[2020/44]
Priority number, dateUS201962836889P22.04.2019         Original published format: US 201962836889 P
US20201682902725.03.2020         Original published format: US202016829027
[2020/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3730067
Date:28.10.2020
Language:EN
[2020/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3730067
Date:21.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/068, A61B17/115, A61B90/98, A61B17/3205, // A61B17/00, A61B17/072, A61B90/00
[2020/44]
CPC:
A61B17/1155 (EP,CN,US); A61B17/11 (CN); A61B90/98 (EP);
A61B2017/00017 (EP); A61B2017/00398 (EP); A61B2017/00473 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP); A61B2017/00486 (US); A61B2017/0053 (US);
A61B2017/07257 (US); A61B2017/07271 (US); A61B2017/07285 (US);
A61B2090/0801 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/21]
Former [2020/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:NACHLADEANORDNUNG FÜR KREISFÖRMIGE KLAMMERVORRICHTUNGEN[2020/44]
English:RELOAD ASSEMBLY FOR CIRCULAR STAPLING DEVICES[2020/44]
French:ENSEMBLE DE RECHARGE POUR DISPOSITIFS D'AGRAFAGE CIRCULAIRE[2020/44]
Examination procedure21.04.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2021Examination requested  [2021/21]
21.04.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2024Fee for grant paid
17.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2823774  (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0030] - [0039] - [0048] - [0051] - [0 70] - [0082]; figures 1,3,11-21, 40, 41 *
by applicantUS9055943
 US2017340351
 US2018125495
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.