blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3718585

EP3718585 - A NEBULISER FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AEROSOLIZED MEDICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2023
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.06.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.03.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.07.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.09.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stamford Devices Limited
IDA Business Park
Dangan, Galway / IE
[2020/41]
Inventor(s)01 / POWER, John
40 Woodland Park
Moycullen
County Galway / IE
02 / MORAN, Declan
Ballymoneen
Cregmore
Claregalway
County Galway / IE
03 / DEVERY, Donal
School Road
Carnmore
Oranmore
County Galway / IE
04 / O'SULLIVAN, Gavan
Legal Lee
Dorrus Park
Kinvarra
County Galway / IE
05 / FINK, James
1660 S. Amphlett Blvd
Suite 360
San Mateo, CA California 94402 / US
06 / SMITH, Niall
11 Clackmannan Road
Alloa, Central Scotland FK10 1RR / GB
 [2020/41]
Representative(s)Weldon O'Brien Ltd.
Shannon Lodge
Casement Road
Bandon
County Cork, P72 TN24 / IE
[2022/29]
Former [2020/41]John A. O'Brien & Associates
Shannon Lodge
Casement Road
Bandon
County Cork, P72 TN24 / IE
Application number, filing date20174258.206.07.2004
[2020/41]
Priority number, dateUS20030488718P18.07.2003         Original published format: US 488718 P
US2004083393227.04.2004         Original published format: US 833932
[2020/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3718585
Date:07.10.2020
Language:EN
[2020/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3718585
Date:13.01.2021
Language:EN
[2021/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3718585
Date:20.07.2022
Language:EN
[2022/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61M11/00, A61M15/00
[2020/41]
CPC:
A61M15/0085 (EP,US); A61M11/005 (EP); B05B17/0607 (EP,US);
A61M11/002 (EP); A61M2205/8206 (EP,US); A61M2205/8237 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2021/31]
Former [2020/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERNEBLER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AEROSOLIERTEM MEDIKAMENT[2020/41]
English:A NEBULISER FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AEROSOLIZED MEDICATION[2020/41]
French:NÉBULISEUR POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MÉDICAMENTS EN AÉROSOL[2020/41]
Examination procedure24.06.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2021Examination requested  [2021/31]
24.06.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.03.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2022Fee for grant paid
08.06.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.06.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04756695.5  / EP1646276
Opposition(s)21.04.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 09
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 10
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 11
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 12
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 13
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 14
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 15
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 16
12.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 17
07.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 18
16.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 19
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.07.2022
CZ20.07.2022
DK20.07.2022
EE20.07.2022
ES20.07.2022
FI20.07.2022
MC20.07.2022
NL20.07.2022
PL20.07.2022
RO20.07.2022
SE20.07.2022
SI20.07.2022
SK20.07.2022
GR21.10.2022
PT21.11.2022
[2024/14]
Former [2023/37]AT20.07.2022
CZ20.07.2022
DK20.07.2022
EE20.07.2022
ES20.07.2022
FI20.07.2022
NL20.07.2022
PL20.07.2022
RO20.07.2022
SE20.07.2022
SI20.07.2022
SK20.07.2022
GR21.10.2022
PT21.11.2022
Former [2023/23]AT20.07.2022
CZ20.07.2022
DK20.07.2022
EE20.07.2022
ES20.07.2022
FI20.07.2022
NL20.07.2022
PL20.07.2022
RO20.07.2022
SE20.07.2022
SK20.07.2022
GR21.10.2022
PT21.11.2022
Former [2023/22]AT20.07.2022
CZ20.07.2022
DK20.07.2022
ES20.07.2022
FI20.07.2022
NL20.07.2022
PL20.07.2022
RO20.07.2022
SE20.07.2022
GR21.10.2022
PT21.11.2022
Former [2023/21]DK20.07.2022
ES20.07.2022
FI20.07.2022
NL20.07.2022
PL20.07.2022
SE20.07.2022
GR21.10.2022
PT21.11.2022
Former [2023/11]ES20.07.2022
FI20.07.2022
NL20.07.2022
PL20.07.2022
SE20.07.2022
GR21.10.2022
PT21.11.2022
Former [2023/10]ES20.07.2022
FI20.07.2022
NL20.07.2022
SE20.07.2022
GR21.10.2022
PT21.11.2022
Former [2023/09]ES20.07.2022
FI20.07.2022
NL20.07.2022
SE20.07.2022
PT21.11.2022
Former [2023/08]ES20.07.2022
FI20.07.2022
NL20.07.2022
SE20.07.2022
Former [2023/06]NL20.07.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]US2622593  (HORACIO PEIRANO) [A] 1-13* the whole document *;
 [X]DE2133377  (RITZAU PARI WERK KG PAUL) [X] 1-6 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 2 *;
 [XD]US6085740  (IVRI YEHUDA [US], et al) [XD] 1-13 * The whole document, especially: column 5, lines 35-36; column 15, line 10 - column 16, line 16; figure 13 *;
 [A]GB2347870  (SUNRISE MEDICAL HHG INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2002134372  (LOEFFLER JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13 * The whole document, especially: paragraphs [0004-0006,0037,0049]; figure 6 *;
 [X]WO03035152  (PARI GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * The whole document, especially: page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 14; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO03041774  (AEROGEN IRELAND LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5164740
 US5586550
 US5758637
 US6085740
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.