blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3748339

EP3748339 - DEVICE FOR GAS ANALYSIS USING RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.09.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.09.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.09.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  06.11.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2024Change - divisional application(s)published on 28.02.2024  [2024/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pietro Fiorentini S.p.A.
Via E. Fermi, 8/10
36057 Arcugnano (VI) / IT
[2020/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Tondello, Giuseppe
Via Montegrappa, 31
35141 PADOVA / IT
02 / Cocola, Lorenzo
Via Elicona, 8
30174 VENEZIA / IT
03 / Poletto, Luca
Via Einstein, 26/A
35136 PADOVA / IT
 [2020/50]
Representative(s)Braidotti, Andrea
Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A.
Via F. Baracca, 5/A
30173 Venezia / IT
[2020/50]
Application number, filing date20175034.615.05.2020
[2020/50]
Priority number, dateIT2019000695417.05.2019         Original published format: IT201900006954
[2020/50]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3748339
Date:09.12.2020
Language:EN
[2020/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3748339
Date:10.03.2021
Language:EN
[2021/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3748339
Date:21.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2021
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/65, G01N21/03, G01J3/44, G01J3/02, G01J3/18, G01J3/28, G01J5/80
[2023/35]
CPC:
G01N21/65 (EP); G01J3/0208 (EP); G01J3/18 (EP);
G01J3/2823 (EP); G01J3/44 (EP); G01J5/806 (EP);
G01N21/0303 (EP); G01N2021/0392 (EP); G01N2021/651 (EP);
G01N2201/0642 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/50]G01N21/65, G01N21/03, G01J3/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/42]  
Former [2020/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR GASANALYSE MITTELS RAMAN-SPEKTROSKOPIE[2020/50]
English:DEVICE FOR GAS ANALYSIS USING RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY[2020/50]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE DE GAZ À L'AIDE DE LA SPECTROSCOPIE RAMAN[2020/50]
Examination procedure10.09.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.09.2021Examination requested  [2021/42]
10.09.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.09.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2024Fee for grant paid
11.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP24151970.1  / EP4339570
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]US4676639  (VAN WAGENEN RICHARD A [US]) [YD] 1 * figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US5455673  (ALSMEYER DANIEL C [US], et al) [Y] 2 * col 6, paragraphs 1-6 *;
 [YD]US5786893  (FINK MANFRED F [US], et al) [YD] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [YD]US6072577  (WUNDERLING MARTIN [DE], et al) [YD] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [YD]US6100975  (SMITH LEE M [US], et al) [YD] 3,9-11,13* figures 1-3, 6, 23, 25 *;
 [Y]US6141095  (ALLEN FRITZ SCHREYER [US], et al) [Y] 2 * col 10, paragraph 2 *;
 [Y]US2002126289  (MARQUARDT BRIAN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-13 * [0002], [0007], [0030], [0034];; figures 1-2, 3A-3B *;
 [Y]US2003120137  (PAWLUCZYK ROMUALD [CA]) [Y] 1,7 * [0078];; figures 1, 5 *;
 [YD]RU2613200  (FED GOSUDARSTVENNOE AVTONOMNOE OBRAZOVATELNOE UCHREZHDENIE VYSSHEGO OBRAZOVANIYA NATSIONALNYJ ISSLED [RU]) [YD] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2018246031  (PROSKUROWSKI GIORA [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-13 * [0005], [0026], [0030], [0031], [0033], [0040], [0044], [0046]-[0047], [0052];; figures 4-6, 8, 10 *;
 [Y]RU2672187  (FEDERALNOE GOSUDARSTVENNOE BYUDZHETNOE UCHREZHDENIE NAUKI INST MONITORINGA KLIMATICHESKIKH I EKOLOGI [RU]) [Y] 1-4,8-13 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]  - HASSEL E P ET AL, "LASER DIAGNOSTICS FOR STUDIES OF TURBULENT COMBUSTION", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20000201), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1088/0957-0233/11/2/201, ISSN 0957-0233, pages R37 - R57, XP000959621 [Y] 1,2,7 * page R48, column 2, paragraph 3;; figures 1, 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/11/2/201
 [Y]  - T. Dreier ET AL, "Determination of temperature and concentration of molecular nitrogen, oxygen and methane with coherent anti-stokes raman scattering", APPLIED PHYSICS B. PHOTOPHYSICS AND LASER CHEMISTRY, DE, (19880301), vol. 45, no. 3, doi:10.1007/BF00695289, ISSN 0721-7269, pages 183 - 190, XP055658222 [Y] 2 * page 184, col 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00695289
 [Y]  - WOODMANSEE M A ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF HIGH-RESOLUTION N2 COHERENT ANTI-STOKES RAMAN SCATTERING FOR MEASURING PRESSURE, TEMPERATURE, AND DENSITY IN HIGH-SPEED GAS FLOWS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20001120), vol. 39, no. 33, doi:10.1364/AO.39.006243, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 6243 - 6256, XP000980954 [Y] 2 * page 6247, col 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.39.006243
ExaminationUS2004042006
 US2004160601
 US2015090900
by applicantUS4676639
 US5786893
 US6072577
 US6100975
 US2006176478
 RU2613200
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.