blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3821943

EP3821943 - BORE BASED MEDICAL SYSTEM COMPRISING A CAMERA CARRIER CONFIGURED TO BE MOUNTED IN THE BORE-BASED MEDICAL SYSTEMS AND UTILIZED FOR POSITIONING AND MONITORING OF PATIENTS DURING RADIOTHERAPY TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.10.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.11.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  16.04.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vision RT Limited
Dove House
Arcadia Avenue
London N3 2JU / GB
[2024/13]
Former [2021/20]For all designated states
Vision RT Limited
Dove House
Arcadia Avenue
London N3 2JU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HALE, Gideon M.
c/o Vision RT Limited
Dove House Arcadia Avenue
London, N3 2JU / GB
 [2021/20]
Representative(s)Hauge, Christian
Demant A/S
Kongebakken 9
2765 Smørum / DK
[2021/20]
Application number, filing date20202722.320.10.2020
[2021/20]
Priority number, dateEP2019020845712.11.2019         Original published format: EP 19208457
EP2020015110610.01.2020         Original published format: EP 20151106
[2021/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3821943
Date:19.05.2021
Language:EN
[2021/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3821943
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2021
ClassificationIPC:A61N5/10, A61B6/00, A61B6/03, A61B5/11, G06T7/00, G06T7/292, A61B6/04, // A61B5/055, A61B5/00
[2021/20]
CPC:
A61B6/035 (EP); A61N5/1049 (EP,CN,US); A61B5/0077 (EP);
A61B5/1113 (EP); A61B5/1128 (EP); A61B6/04 (EP);
A61B6/4435 (EP); A61N5/1001 (US); A61N5/103 (US);
A61N5/1075 (EP,US); A61N5/1081 (EP,US); A61B5/0035 (EP);
A61N2005/1019 (US); A61N2005/1056 (EP); A61N2005/1059 (EP,CN,US);
A61N2005/1072 (US); A61N2005/1076 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/52]  
Former [2021/20]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BOHRUNGSBASIERTES MEDIZINISCHES SYSTEM MIT EINEM KAMERATRÄGER MIT KONFIGURATION ZUR MONTAGE IN DEN BOHRUNGSBASIERTEN MEDIZINISCHEN SYSTEMEN UND ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR DIE POSITIONIERUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON PATIENTEN WÄHREND DER STRAHLENTHERAPIEBEHANDLUNG[2021/20]
English:BORE BASED MEDICAL SYSTEM COMPRISING A CAMERA CARRIER CONFIGURED TO BE MOUNTED IN THE BORE-BASED MEDICAL SYSTEMS AND UTILIZED FOR POSITIONING AND MONITORING OF PATIENTS DURING RADIOTHERAPY TREATMENT[2021/20]
French:SYSTÈME MÉDICAL À BASE D'ALÉSAGE COMPORTANT UN SUPPORT DE CAMÉRA CONÇU POUR ÊTRE MONTÉ DANS LES SYSTÈMES MÉDICAUX À BASE D'ALÉSAGE ET UTILISÉ POUR LE POSITIONNEMENT ET LA SURVEILLANCE DE PATIENTS LORS D'UN TRAITEMENT PAR RADIOTHÉRAPIE[2021/20]
Examination procedure19.11.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2021Examination requested  [2021/52]
19.11.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2024Fee for grant paid
16.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2010059679  (ALBRECHT HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 4,5 * [A] 2-15;
 [A]US2017143271  (GUSTAFSSON ULF PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0093] * * figures 5-7 * * paragraph [0069] *;
 [A]US2017319143  (YU JEFFREY N [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 4I,4H * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0136] *;
 [A]US2018192984  (LEE JONG KEE [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 ** paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0098] *;
 [XI]US2019321657  (HALE GIDEON M [GB]) [X] 1,3-12 * figures 19-22,5,8 * * paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0161] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0163] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0148] * [I] 2,13-15
by applicantEP3218871
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.