blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3945704

EP3945704 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR SECURING DATA, ESPECIALLY DATA OF BIOTECHNOLOGICAL LABORATORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2023
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.01.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.10.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.06.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.12.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 13.03.2024  [2024/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
diCELLa Sp. z o.o.
ul. Podole 60
30-394 Kraków / PL
[2022/08]
Former [2022/05]For all designated states
diCELLa Sp. z o.o.
ul. Rakowicka 5/5
31-511 Krakow / PL
Inventor(s)01 / Kubica-Misztal, Aleksandra
30-499 Krakow / PL
02 / Misztal, Krzysztof
30-499 Krakow / PL
03 / Sluzalec, Tomasz
42-200 Czestochowa / PL
 [2022/05]
Representative(s)AOMB Polska Sp. z.o.o.
ul. Rondo Ignacego Daszynskiego 1
00-843 Warsaw / PL
[2023/06]
Former [2022/05]AOMB Polska Sp. z.o.o.
Ul. Emilii Plater 53
21st Floor
00-113 Warsaw / PL
Application number, filing date20215367.218.12.2020
[2022/05]
Priority number, datePL2020043484529.07.2020         Original published format: PL 43484520
[2022/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3945704
Date:02.02.2022
Language:EN
[2022/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3945704
Date:08.02.2023
Language:EN
[2023/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2021
ClassificationIPC:H04L9/40, H04L9/32, H04L9/00
[2022/42]
CPC:
H04L63/12 (EP,IL); H04L9/0643 (US); G06F21/64 (US);
H04L9/3239 (EP,IL); H04L9/3247 (EP,IL); H04L9/3297 (EP,IL);
H04L9/50 (EP,IL); H04L2209/56 (EP,IL) (-)
Former IPC [2022/05]H04L29/06, H04L9/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/27]
Former [2022/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SICHERUNG VON DATEN, INSBESONDERE DATEN VON BIOTECHNOLOGISCHEN LABORS[2022/05]
English:A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR SECURING DATA, ESPECIALLY DATA OF BIOTECHNOLOGICAL LABORATORIES[2022/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR SÉCURISER DES DONNÉES, EN PARTICULIER DES DONNÉES DE LABORATOIRES BIOTECHNOLOGIQUES[2022/05]
Examination procedure30.05.2022Examination requested  [2022/27]
30.05.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.10.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2022Fee for grant paid
16.11.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.11.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.11.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2024/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.02.2023
CZ08.02.2023
DK08.02.2023
EE08.02.2023
ES08.02.2023
FI08.02.2023
HR08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
LV08.02.2023
NL08.02.2023
RO08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
SI08.02.2023
SK08.02.2023
SM08.02.2023
GR09.05.2023
IS08.06.2023
PT09.06.2023
[2024/11]
Former [2023/50]AT08.02.2023
CZ08.02.2023
DK08.02.2023
EE08.02.2023
ES08.02.2023
FI08.02.2023
HR08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
LV08.02.2023
NL08.02.2023
RO08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
SK08.02.2023
SM08.02.2023
GR09.05.2023
IS08.06.2023
PT09.06.2023
Former [2023/49]AT08.02.2023
CZ08.02.2023
DK08.02.2023
EE08.02.2023
ES08.02.2023
FI08.02.2023
HR08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
LV08.02.2023
NL08.02.2023
RO08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
SM08.02.2023
GR09.05.2023
IS08.06.2023
PT09.06.2023
Former [2023/48]AT08.02.2023
DK08.02.2023
EE08.02.2023
ES08.02.2023
FI08.02.2023
HR08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
LV08.02.2023
NL08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
SM08.02.2023
GR09.05.2023
IS08.06.2023
PT09.06.2023
Former [2023/46]AT08.02.2023
DK08.02.2023
ES08.02.2023
FI08.02.2023
HR08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
LV08.02.2023
NL08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
SM08.02.2023
GR09.05.2023
IS08.06.2023
PT09.06.2023
Former [2023/39]AT08.02.2023
ES08.02.2023
FI08.02.2023
HR08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
LV08.02.2023
NL08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
GR09.05.2023
IS08.06.2023
PT09.06.2023
Former [2023/37]AT08.02.2023
ES08.02.2023
FI08.02.2023
HR08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
LV08.02.2023
NL08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
GR09.05.2023
PT09.06.2023
Former [2023/36]AT08.02.2023
ES08.02.2023
FI08.02.2023
HR08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
LV08.02.2023
NL08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
PT09.06.2023
Former [2023/35]AT08.02.2023
ES08.02.2023
HR08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
NL08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
PT09.06.2023
Former [2023/34]ES08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
RS08.02.2023
PT09.06.2023
Former [2023/33]ES08.02.2023
LT08.02.2023
Documents cited:Search[A]US2019294822  (HENNEBERT CHRISTINE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0023] * * figure 3 ** paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0100] *;
 [A]WO2019228560  (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD [CN]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0075] *
by applicantUS2017364637
    - Secure hash standard. Federal Information Processing Standard (FIPS, (20120000), pages 180 - 4
    - ANGRAAL, S.KRUMHOLZ, H.M.SCHULZ, W.L., "Blockchain technology: applications in health care", Circulation: Cardiovascular Quality and Outcomes, (20170000), vol. 10, no. 9, doi:10.1161/CIRCOUTCOMES.117.003800, page e003800, XP055573920

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCOUTCOMES.117.003800
    - DWORKIN, M.J., "Sha-3 standard: Permutation-based hash and extendable-output functions", Federal Information Processing Standards(NIST FIPS, (20150000), vol. 202
    - GALLAGHER, P., "Digital signature standard (dss", Federal Information Processing Stan- dards Publications, (20130000), vol. FIPS, pages 186 - 3
    - "Decentralizing privacy: Using blockchain to protect personal data", ZYSKIND, G.NATHAN, O. et al., 2015 IEEE Security and Privacy Workshops, IEEE, (20150000), pages 180 - 184
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.