EP4019639 - PROMOTING REGENERATION AND TRANSFORMATION IN BETA VULGARIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KWS SAAT SE & Co. KGaA Grimsehlstraße 31 37574 Einbeck / DE | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONG, Jixiang 37574 Einbeck / DE | 02 /
MARTIN-ORTIGOSA, Susana 37574 Einbeck / DE | 03 /
PACHECO VILLALOBOS, David 37574 Einbeck / DE | 04 /
KASTNER, Christine 37574 Einbeck / DE | 05 /
LUDEWIG, Frank 37574 Einbeck / DE | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20216530.4 | 22.12.2020 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019639 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H4/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
A01H4/002 (EP);
A01H4/005 (EP);
A01H4/008 (EP);
C12N15/8201 (EP);
C12N15/821 (EP);
C12N15/8213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÖRDERUNG DER REGENERATION UND TRANSFORMATION IN BETA VULGARIS | [2022/26] | English: | PROMOTING REGENERATION AND TRANSFORMATION IN BETA VULGARIS | [2022/26] | French: | PROMOTION DE RÉGÉNÉRATION ET DE TRANSFORMATION EN BETA VULGARIS | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 09.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0075330 (PLANT RES INTERNAT [NL], et al); | [XDY]US7388126 (DUNCAN DAVID R [US], et al); | [XDY]US7855325 (DUNCAN DAVID R [US], et al); | [XY]WO2011003850 (ENZA ZADEN BEHEER BV [NL], et al); | [X]WO2011003471 (HEIDMANN IRIS ALKE [NL], et al); | [Y]WO2011082310 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al); | [Y]WO2019122394 (KWS SAAT SE & CO KGAA [DE]); | [A]WO2019177978 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]); | [A]WO2019238911 (KWS SAAT SE & CO KGAA [DE]); | [A]WO2019238909 (KWS SAAT SE & CO KGAA [DE]); | [A]WO2019238908 (KWS SAAT SE & CO KGAA [DE]); | [A]WO2020185751 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]); | by applicant | WO9418313 | WO9509233 | WO0216655 | US2002046419 | WO03004659 | WO03080809 | EP1452596 | US7388126 | WO2010079430 | US7855325 | WO2011003850 | WO2011072246 | WO2011146121 | WO2011154393 | WO2012001527 | WO2012093833 | WO2012104729 | WO2012138927 | WO2012138939 | WO2016021973 | WO2019238911 |