blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3845825

EP3845825 - HEAT EXCHANGER UNIT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.10.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.01.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.06.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 06.03.2024  [2024/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyungdong Navien Co., Ltd.
95, Suworam-gil
Seotan-myeon
Pyeongtaek-si, Gyeonggi-do 17704 / KR
[2021/27]
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Jun Kyu
15, Gyeongin-ro 53-gil, Guro-gu
08217 Seoul / KR
02 / CHO, Sung Cheul
15, Gyeongin-ro 53-gil, Guro-gu
08217 Seoul / KR
 [2021/27]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[2024/10]
Former [2021/27]Kruspig, Volkmar
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date20217737.430.12.2020
[2021/27]
Priority number, dateKR2019017839030.12.2019         Original published format: KR 20190178390
KR2020008387908.07.2020         Original published format: KR 20200083879
[2021/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3845825
Date:07.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3845825
Date:06.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2021
ClassificationIPC:F24H1/26, F24H9/14, F28D1/00, F24H1/40, F24H1/44, F24H8/00, F24H1/30, F28D7/00
[2023/44]
CPC:
F24H8/00 (EP,CN,KR,US); B23K1/0012 (KR); B23P15/26 (US);
F24H1/0072 (US); F24H1/201 (US); F24H1/30 (EP);
F24H1/40 (EP); F24H1/445 (EP); F24H7/005 (US);
F24H9/0005 (CN); F24H9/06 (KR,US); F24H9/146 (EP,US);
F24H9/148 (KR); F24H9/1836 (CN); F28D1/05366 (KR);
F28D7/00 (EP); F28F2275/04 (US); Y02B30/00 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2021/27]F24H1/26, F24H1/30, F24H8/00, F24H1/44, F24H1/40, F28D1/00, F24H9/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/07]
Former [2021/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:WÄRMETAUSCHEREINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2021/27]
English:HEAT EXCHANGER UNIT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2021/27]
French:UNITÉ D'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2021/27]
Examination procedure07.01.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2022Examination requested  [2022/07]
07.01.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2024Fee for grant paid
25.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]FR2640028  (GEMINOX SA [FR]) [X] 1-7,9-14 * page 4, line 18 - page 9, line 20; figures 1-5 *[I] 8,15;
 [XI]KR20020067301  (KYUNG DONG BOILER CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,9-14 * the whole document * [I] 8,15;
 [X]US2016377320  (KIM YOUNG MO [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-21 *;
 [XI]KR20180007933  (KYUNGDONG NAVIEN CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,9-14 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-8 * [I] 8,15;
 [X]US2018087806  (KONDO MASAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0097]; figures 1-12 *;
 [XI]US2018372311  (ONO TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-7 * [I] 8,15
ExaminationKR100390521B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.