blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3927638

EP3927638 - ACCESSORY DEVICE FOR FACILITATING THE FEEDING OF SHEETS OF MATERIAL TO BE CUT IN NUMERICAL CONTROL MACHINES (NCMS), AND NCM COMPRISING SAID ACCESSORY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.09.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.11.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.08.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 07.02.2024  [2024/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comelz S.p.A.
Viale Indipendenza 55
27029 Vigevano / IT
[2021/52]
Inventor(s)01 / CORSICO PICCOLINO, Alessandro
Viale Indipendenza, 55
27029 Vigevano (PV) / IT
 [2024/06]
Former [2021/52]01 / CORSICO PICCOLINO, Alessandro
27029 Vigevano (PV) / IT
Representative(s)Botti & Ferrari S.p.A.
Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
[2024/06]
Former [2021/52]Botti, Mario
Botti & Ferrari S.p.A.
Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date20704886.917.02.2020
[2021/52]
WO2020EP54067
Priority number, dateEP2019015806819.02.2019         Original published format: EP 19158068
EP2019018494008.07.2019         Original published format: EP 19184940
[2021/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020169517
Date:27.08.2020
Language:EN
[2020/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3927638
Date:29.12.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3927638
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.08.2020
ClassificationIPC:B65H5/04, C14B17/06, B26D5/20, B26D5/22, B65H20/18, A41H3/00, B26D5/00, C14B5/00, D06H7/00
[2021/52]
CPC:
B26D7/025 (EP); B26D7/0625 (EP); B65H5/04 (EP);
C14B17/06 (EP); C14B5/00 (EP); D06H7/00 (EP);
B26F1/3813 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/52]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSATZVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DER ZUFUHR VON IN CNC-MASCHINEN ZU SCHNEIDENDEN MATERIALBÖGEN[2023/39]
English:ACCESSORY DEVICE FOR FACILITATING THE FEEDING OF SHEETS OF MATERIAL TO BE CUT IN NUMERICAL CONTROL MACHINES (NCMS), AND NCM COMPRISING SAID ACCESSORY DEVICE[2021/52]
French:DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE POUR FACILITER L'ALIMENTATION DE FEUILLES DE MATÉRIAU À DÉCOUPER DANS DES MACHINES CNC[2023/39]
Former [2021/52]ZUSATZVORRICHTUNG ZUM ERLEICHTERN DER ZUFÜHRUNG VON BÖGEN VON ZU SCHNEIDENDEM MATERIAL IN NUMERISCH GESTEUERTEN MASCHINEN (NCM) UND NCM MIT DER ZUSATZVORRICHTUNG
Former [2021/52]DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE PERMETTANT DE FACILITER L'ALIMENTATION DE FEUILLES DE MATÉRIAU À DÉCOUPER DANS DES MACHINES À COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE (NCM) ET NCM COMPRENANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE
Entry into regional phase15.09.2021National basic fee paid 
15.09.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2021Examination requested  [2021/52]
15.09.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.04.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2023Fee for grant paid
21.12.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]GB848162  (MELKA AB) [X] 1,2 * page 1, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-10,12,15 [Y] 11,14 [I] 13;
 [A]US6624381  (HAFFNER SERGE LUC [FR]) [A] 1,11* page 1, column 2, line 75 - page 2, column 1, line 21; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]EP2022741  (ATOM SPA [IT]) [Y] 14 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]CN107313237  (GUANGDONG ESQUEL TEXTILES CO, et al) [Y] 11,14 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.