blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3921514

EP3921514 - TUNNEL LINING OF REINFORCED CONCRETE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2021/50]REINFORCED CONCRETE TUBBING SEGMENT
[2024/04]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.11.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.08.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technische Universität Wien
Karlsplatz 13
1040 Wien / AT
[2021/50]
Inventor(s)01 / KOLLEGGER, Johann
Mühlengasse 23
3400 Klosterneuburg / AT
02 / PROKSCH-WEILGUNI, Clemens
Erlachgasse 94/20
1100 Wien / AT
03 / WOLFGER, Hannes
Steinbüchl 96
8294 Buch-St. Magdalena / AT
04 / DECKER, Marion
Liechtensteinstraße 124/3
1090 Wien / AT
 [2022/12]
Former [2021/50]01 / KOLLEGGER, Johann
3400 Klosterneuburg / AT
02 / PROKSCH-WEILGUNI, Clemens
1100 Wien / AT
03 / WOLFGER, Hannes
8294 Buch-St. Magdalena / AT
Representative(s)Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH
Patentanwälte
Wipplingerstraße 30
1010 Wien / AT
[2021/50]
Application number, filing date20705273.904.02.2020
[2021/50]
WO2020AT60030
Priority number, dateAT2019006002204.02.2019         Original published format: AT 600222019
AT2019005043314.05.2019         Original published format: AT 504332019
[2021/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020160582
Date:13.08.2020
Language:DE
[2020/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3921514
Date:15.12.2021
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3921514
Date:03.04.2024
Language:DE
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.2020
ClassificationIPC:E21D11/08
[2021/50]
CPC:
E21D11/08 (EP,AT)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/50]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TÜBBING AUS BEWEHRTEM BETON[2021/50]
English:TUNNEL LINING OF REINFORCED CONCRETE[2024/04]
French:VOUSSOIR DE TUNNEL EN BÉTON ARMÉ[2024/04]
Former [2021/50]REINFORCED CONCRETE TUBBING SEGMENT
Former [2021/50]SEGMENT DE CUVELAGE EN BÉTON ARMÉ
Entry into regional phase18.08.2021National basic fee paid 
18.08.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2021Examination requested  [2021/50]
18.08.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.04.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2024Fee for grant paid
22.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]US1969810  (MALCOLM MCALPINE) [AD] 1-20* the whole document *
by applicantUS1969810
 DE2522789
 JPH01502207
 JPH11287093
 EP1243753
 AT518840
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.