blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3927946

EP3927946 - METHOD FOR REPAIRING A TURBOMACHINE ROTOR BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.11.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.08.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES
2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[2021/52]
Inventor(s)01 / CHARPENTIER, Sébastien, Maurice, Lucien
SAFRAN CEPI Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
02 / RIX, Sébastien, Jean, François
SAFRAN CEPI Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
 [2024/13]
Former [2021/52]01 / CHARPENTIER, Sébastien, Maurice, Lucien
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
02 / RIX, Sébastien, Jean, François
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
Representative(s)Gevers & Orès
Immeuble le Palatin 2
3 Cours du Triangle
CS 80165
92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
[2021/52]
Application number, filing date20713944.521.02.2020
[2021/52]
WO2020FR50335
Priority number, dateFR2019000177821.02.2019         Original published format: FR 1901778
[2021/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020169938
Date:27.08.2020
Language:FR
[2020/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3927946
Date:29.12.2021
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3927946
Date:27.03.2024
Language:FR
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.08.2020
ClassificationIPC:B23P6/00, F01D5/00, F01D5/14, F01D5/28
[2023/43]
CPC:
F01D5/005 (EP); F01D5/147 (EP,US); B23K26/342 (US);
B23K37/003 (US); B23P6/007 (EP,US); B29C73/00 (US);
F01D5/282 (EP,US); B23K2101/001 (US); B23K2103/14 (US);
B23K2103/52 (US); B29L2031/082 (US); F01D5/288 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US); F05D2220/36 (EP); F05D2230/80 (EP,US);
F05D2240/30 (US); F05D2240/303 (EP); F05D2300/174 (EP);
F05D2300/603 (EP); Y02T50/60 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2021/52]F01D5/14, F01D5/28, F01D5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR EINER TURBOMASCHINENROTORSCHAUFEL[2021/52]
English:METHOD FOR REPAIRING A TURBOMACHINE ROTOR BLADE[2021/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION D'UNE AUBE D'HÉLICE DE TURBOMACHINE[2021/52]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2021National basic fee paid 
15.09.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2021Examination requested  [2021/52]
15.09.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2024Fee for grant paid
06.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2327812  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [X]DE102010006384  (LUFTHANSA TECHNIK AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0015] , [0032] - [0040]; figure - *;
 [XYI]EP3045260  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,6-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0031]; figure - * [Y] 10,11 [I] 3-5;
 [A]FR3045710  (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [YD]FR3046557  (SNECMA [FR]) [YD] 10,11 * paragraph [0017]; figure - *
by applicantDE102010006384
 EP3045260
 FR3046557
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.