blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4127984

EP4127984 - NEURAL NETWORK WATERMARKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.01.2023
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.10.2021
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2023/06]
Inventor(s)01 / STERNBY, Jakob
Körsbärsvägen 6
223 55 Lund / SE
02 / JOHANSSON, Björn
Råkvägen 25
237 36 Bjärred / SE
 [2023/06]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2023/06]
Application number, filing date20717143.001.04.2020
[2023/06]
WO2020EP59283
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021197600
Date:07.10.2021
Language:EN
[2021/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4127984
Date:08.02.2023
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2023/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4127984
Date:21.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.2021
ClassificationIPC:G06F21/16, G06N3/04, G06N3/08
[2023/52]
CPC:
G06F21/16 (EP,US); G06N3/08 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2023/06]G06F21/16, G06N3/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASSERZEICHENMARKIERUNG EINES NEURONALEN NETZES[2023/06]
English:NEURAL NETWORK WATERMARKING[2023/06]
French:FILIGRANE DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL[2023/06]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2022National basic fee paid 
31.10.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2022Examination requested  [2023/06]
31.10.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2024Fee for grant paid
10.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004042650  (II DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 11,12,23,24 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 28] *;
 [A]WO2016043734  (HEWLETT PACKARD ENTPR DEV LP [US]) [A] 1-10,12-22,24 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 14] , [0 19] , [0 20] , [0 26] , [0 29] , [0 30] , [0 31] *;
 [A]US2019362232  (NAGAI YUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10,12-22,24 * paragraphs [0032] , [0 34] - [0037] *;
 [XA]US2020074581  (NEMES CSABA [HU], et al) [X] 11,12,23,24 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 29] , [0 35] , [0 38] , [0 39] , [0 49] , [0 54] * [A] 1-10,13-22;
 [A]  - VEERAPRASIT S ET AL, "Neural Network-Based Teeth Recognition Using Singular Value Decomposition and Color Histogram", INFORMATION ENGINEERING AND COMPUTER SCIENCE (ICIECS), 2010 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101225), ISBN 978-1-4244-7939-9, pages 1 - 4, XP031841894 [A] 11,12,23,24 * section III.A, last paragraph, last three sentences *
 [A]  - BULOT R ET AL, "EXPLICIT KNOWLEDGE AND NEURAL NETWORKS FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY (EUROSPEECH). PARIS, SEPT. 26 - 28, 1989; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY (EUROSPEECH)], EDINBURGH, CEP CONSULTANTS, GB, (19890901), vol. 2, pages 533 - 536, XP000214284 [A] 11,12,23,24 * section IV, last paragraph, last sentence *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.