blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3924606

EP3924606 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FILLING AN OIL RESERVOIR OF AN AIRCRAFT ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2023
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.09.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.11.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.10.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES
2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[2021/51]
Inventor(s)01 / SANTIN, Mathieu, Jean, Jacques
c/o SAFRAN CEPI
Rond-Point René Ravaud -Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
02 / DUPAYS, Clément
c/o SAFRAN CEPI
Rond-Point René Ravaud -Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
03 / WAISSI, Bellal
c/o SAFRAN CEPI
Rond-Point René Ravaud -Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
 [2023/07]
Former [2021/51]01 / SANTIN, Mathieu, Jean, Jacques
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
02 / DUPAYS, Clément
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
03 / WAISSI, Bellal
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
Representative(s)Brevalex
Tour Trinity
1 B Place de la Défense
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[N/P]
Former [2023/07]Brevalex
Tour Trinity
1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense
CS 60347
92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
Former [2021/51]Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
Application number, filing date20726190.013.03.2020
[2021/51]
WO2020FR50532
Priority number, dateFR2019000358303.04.2019         Original published format: FR 1903583
[2021/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020201651
Date:08.10.2020
Language:FR
[2020/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3924606
Date:22.12.2021
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3924606
Date:15.02.2023
Language:FR
[2023/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.2020
ClassificationIPC:F01M11/04, F01M11/12, B64F5/40, F01D25/18, F02C7/06, F01D25/20, F01M11/06, F16N19/00
[2021/51]
CPC:
F01M11/0458 (EP,CN); F01D25/20 (EP,CN); B64F5/40 (EP,US);
F01M11/04 (US); F01M11/061 (EP,CN); F01M11/12 (EP,CN,US);
F02C7/06 (EP,CN); F16N19/006 (EP,CN); G05D9/02 (US);
G05D9/12 (US); F05D2260/98 (EP,CN); F16N2210/02 (EP,CN);
F16N2260/04 (EP,CN) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEFÜLLEN EINES ÖLRESERVOIRS EINES FLUGZEUGTRIEBWERKS[2021/51]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FILLING AN OIL RESERVOIR OF AN AIRCRAFT ENGINE[2021/51]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN RESERVOIR D'HUILE D'UN MOTEUR D'AERONEF[2022/40]
Former [2021/51]DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN RESERVOIR D'HUILE D'UN MOTEUR D'AERONEF
Entry into regional phase15.09.2021National basic fee paid 
15.09.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2021Examination requested  [2021/51]
15.09.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.09.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2023Fee for grant paid
05.01.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.01.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.11.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.02.2023
CZ15.02.2023
DK15.02.2023
EE15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
MC15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RO15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
SI15.02.2023
SK15.02.2023
SM15.02.2023
IE13.03.2023
LU13.03.2023
BE31.03.2023
CH31.03.2023
LI31.03.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
IS15.06.2023
PT15.06.2023
[2024/11]
Former [2024/09]AT15.02.2023
CZ15.02.2023
DK15.02.2023
EE15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
MC15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RO15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
SK15.02.2023
SM15.02.2023
IE13.03.2023
LU13.03.2023
CH31.03.2023
LI31.03.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
IS15.06.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2024/08]AT15.02.2023
CZ15.02.2023
DK15.02.2023
EE15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
MC15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RO15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
SK15.02.2023
SM15.02.2023
IE13.03.2023
LU13.03.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
IS15.06.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2024/02]AT15.02.2023
CZ15.02.2023
DK15.02.2023
EE15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RO15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
SK15.02.2023
SM15.02.2023
LU13.03.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
IS15.06.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/50]AT15.02.2023
CZ15.02.2023
DK15.02.2023
EE15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RO15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
SK15.02.2023
SM15.02.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
IS15.06.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/49]AT15.02.2023
CZ15.02.2023
DK15.02.2023
EE15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RO15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
SM15.02.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
IS15.06.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/48]AT15.02.2023
DK15.02.2023
EE15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
SM15.02.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
IS15.06.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/46]AT15.02.2023
DK15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
SM15.02.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
IS15.06.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/39]AT15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
IS15.06.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/38]AT15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
PL15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/37]AT15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
NO15.05.2023
GR16.05.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/36]AT15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
FI15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
LV15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
SE15.02.2023
NO15.05.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/35]AT15.02.2023
ES15.02.2023
HR15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
NL15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
NO15.05.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/34]ES15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
RS15.02.2023
PT15.06.2023
Former [2023/33]ES15.02.2023
LT15.02.2023
Cited inInternational search[A]FR899615  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 9 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4024887  (MCGREGOR RONALD W) [A] 1-20 * column 1, lines 7-9; figures 1, 2, 5 * * column 2, lines 19-47, 60-62 * * column 3, lines 35-52 * * column 5, lines 49-65 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 35 * * column 8, lines 39-66 * * column 12, lines 11-20 *;
 [A]US2010230003  (ROLLINS MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 7] , [0 15] - [0016]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US2014007675  (MEHRER MICHAEL E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [00 4] - [0005] - [0 12] - [0013] - [0 14] - [0016] - [0 20] , [0 29]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]FR3020093  (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1,13,20* abstract *
by applicantUS4024887
 US2014007675
 WO2019122658
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.