blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4010276

EP4010276 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HANDLING PIECE GOODS MOVING IN AT LEAST ONE ROW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2023
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.05.2022
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.02.2021
Formerunknown
Status updated on  31.07.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, SM
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones Aktiengesellschaft
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2022/24]
Inventor(s)01 / HENSEL, Thomas
Böhmerwaldstr. 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
02 / KOLLMUSS, Manuel
Böhmerwaldstr. 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
03 / LEHNER, Thomas
Böhmerwaldstr. 5
93073 Neutraublin / DE
 [2022/24]
Representative(s)Benninger, Johannes
Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5
93049 Regensburg / DE
[2022/24]
Application number, filing date20743572.821.07.2020
[2022/24]
WO2020EP70515
Priority number, dateDE20191012142908.08.2019         Original published format: DE102019121429
[2022/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2021023504
Date:11.02.2021
Language:DE
[2021/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4010276
Date:15.06.2022
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4010276
Date:20.09.2023
Language:DE
[2023/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.2021
ClassificationIPC:B65G43/08, B65G47/08, B65G21/20, G01B21/06
[2022/24]
CPC:
B65G43/08 (EP,CN,US); B65G61/00 (CN,US); B65G47/086 (EP,US);
B65B35/50 (CN); B65G21/2072 (EP,US); B65G47/08 (CN);
B65G47/22 (CN); B65G47/905 (US); G01B5/046 (EP);
G01S15/06 (US); B65G2203/0233 (US); B65G2203/042 (CN,US);
B65G2203/044 (US); G01B21/06 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM UMGANG MIT UND/ODER ZUR HANDHABUNG VON IN MINDESTENS EINER REIHE BEWEGTEN STÜCKGÜTERN[2022/24]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HANDLING PIECE GOODS MOVING IN AT LEAST ONE ROW[2022/24]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MANUTENTION ET/OU DE MANIPULATION D'AU MOINS UNE RANGÉE DE MARCHANDISES DE DÉTAIL EN DÉFILEMENT[2022/24]
Entry into regional phase23.12.2021National basic fee paid 
23.12.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2021Examination requested  [2022/24]
23.12.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.08.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2023Fee for grant paid
10.08.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI20.09.2023
HR20.09.2023
LT20.09.2023
LV20.09.2023
NL20.09.2023
RS20.09.2023
SE20.09.2023
SM20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
IS20.01.2024
[2024/20]
Former [2024/14]FI20.09.2023
HR20.09.2023
LT20.09.2023
LV20.09.2023
NL20.09.2023
RS20.09.2023
SE20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
Former [2024/10]FI20.09.2023
HR20.09.2023
LT20.09.2023
LV20.09.2023
RS20.09.2023
SE20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
Former [2024/09]FI20.09.2023
LT20.09.2023
SE20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
Former [2024/08]LT20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS5830612  (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 7,14 * abstract ** figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JP2013107119  (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 7,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0044] * * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]CN104251683  (HUZHOU KENI LOGISTICS EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 7,14 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *;
 [XI]US2016096274  (BAYLOR DARIN JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-13 * paragraphs [0091] - [0126] * * claim 2 * * figures 1-6 * [I] 6,15;
 [A]US2016362258  (ANDERS DANIEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0033] - [0053] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [XI]DE102016211281  (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,13 * paragraphs [0076] - [0078] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 3,6,11,12,15;
 [XDI]DE102017002752  (KRONES AG [DE]) [XD] 1,2,4-6,8-10,13 * paragraphs [0032] - [0086] * * figures 1-16 * [I] 3,11,12,15;
 [XI]DE102017118928  (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,13,15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0048] * * figures 1-24 * [I] 3,11,12
by applicantDE3607858
 WO2004076319
 DE102013202872
 WO2016023135
 WO2017141066
 DE102017002752
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.