blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4004563

EP4004563 - METHOD OF LOADING SAMPLES INTO A SAMPLE MANAGER OF A CHROMATOGRAPHY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.09.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.04.2022
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.02.2021
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.08.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 28.02.2024  [2024/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Waters Technologies Corporation
34 Maple Street
Milford, MA 01757 / US
[2022/22]
Inventor(s)01 / MUSACCHIO, Jeffrey
11 Lyndon Road
Sharon, Massachusetts 02067 / US
 [2022/22]
Representative(s)Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Straße 11
80636 München / DE
[2022/22]
Application number, filing date20754559.127.07.2020
[2022/22]
WO2020US43685
Priority number, dateUS201962879659P29.07.2019         Original published format: US 201962879659 P
[2022/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021021702
Date:04.02.2021
Language:EN
[2021/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4004563
Date:01.06.2022
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4004563
Date:28.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.2021
ClassificationIPC:G01N35/04, G01N35/02, G01N30/24, G01N35/00
[2022/22]
CPC:
G01N35/04 (EP); G01N30/18 (CN); G01N35/10 (US);
G01N30/02 (CN); G01N30/20 (CN,US); G01N35/0099 (EP,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP); G01N2035/0418 (EP); G01N2035/0465 (EP);
G01N2035/0477 (EP); G01N2035/0484 (EP); G01N2035/0498 (EP);
G01N2035/1027 (US); G01N2035/1051 (US); G01N30/24 (EP);
G01N35/026 (EP); G01N35/028 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN VON PROBEN IN EINEN PROBENMANAGER EINES CHROMATOGRAPHIE-SYSTEMS[2023/38]
English:METHOD OF LOADING SAMPLES INTO A SAMPLE MANAGER OF A CHROMATOGRAPHY SYSTEM[2022/22]
French:PROCEDE DE CHARGEMENT D'ECHANTILLONS DANS UN GESTIONNAIRE D'ECHANTILLONS D'UN SYSTEME DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE[2023/38]
Former [2022/22]VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN VON PROBEN IN EINEN PROBENMANAGER EINES CHROMATOGRAFIESYSTEMS
Former [2022/22]PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLONS DANS UN GESTIONNAIRE D'ÉCHANTILLONS D'UN SYSTÈME DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE
Entry into regional phase11.01.2022National basic fee paid 
11.01.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2022Examination requested  [2022/22]
11.01.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.08.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2024Fee for grant paid
22.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XAY]FR2788042  (CHAUMAT PIERRE [FR]) [X] 10-14,16,17 * pages 2-4; figures 1, 6, 7 * [A] 1-9 [Y] 15;
 [YA]US2014079606  (BURNETT JOSHUA A [US], et al) [Y] 15 * Abstract; paragraphs [0025] , [0 31] , [0 38]; figures 2, 5, 6 * [A] 1-9;
 [AP]US2019383776  (SIMPSON DAVID A [US], et al) [AP] 1-17* paragraphs [0074] - [0077]; figures 6, 7, 9, 10 *
by applicantUS9194847
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.