blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4042105

EP4042105 - MAP INCLUDING DATA FOR ROUTING AERIAL VEHICLES DURING GNSS FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.10.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.07.2022
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.05.2021
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.09.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wing Aviation LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View CA 94043 / US
[2022/33]
Inventor(s)01 / KUBIE, Martin
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
02 / ABEYWARDENA, Dinuka
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
 [2022/33]
Representative(s)Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2022/33]
Application number, filing date20775539.808.09.2020
[2022/33]
WO2020US49664
Priority number, dateUS20191668987220.11.2019         Original published format: US201916689872
[2022/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021101618
Date:27.05.2021
Language:EN
[2021/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4042105
Date:17.08.2022
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4042105
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.2021
ClassificationIPC:G01C21/16, G08G5/00, G05D1/10, G06T7/246, G06T7/73
[2023/35]
CPC:
G01C21/16 (EP); G08G5/0069 (EP,US); B64C39/024 (US);
B64U10/25 (EP); G05D1/0038 (US); G05D1/0044 (US);
G05D1/0094 (US); G05D1/102 (EP); G05D1/222 (US);
G05D1/225 (US); G05D1/689 (US); G06T7/246 (EP);
G06T7/73 (EP); G08G5/0013 (EP); G08G5/0021 (EP);
G08G5/0039 (EP); G08G5/0052 (EP); G08G5/0056 (EP);
G08G5/006 (EP); G08G5/0086 (EP); G08G5/0091 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US); B64U2101/30 (EP,US); B64U2201/104 (US);
G06T2207/10032 (EP); G06T2207/20016 (EP); G06T2207/20021 (EP);
G06T2207/30168 (EP); G06T2207/30184 (EP); G06T2207/30212 (EP);
G06T2207/30232 (EP); G06T2207/30241 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2022/33]G01C21/16, G05D1/10, G06T7/73, G08G5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KARTE MIT DATEN FÜR DIE LOKALISIERUNG VON LUFTFAHRZEUGEN BEI AUSFALL EINES GNSS[2023/41]
English:MAP INCLUDING DATA FOR ROUTING AERIAL VEHICLES DURING GNSS FAILURE[2022/33]
French:CARTE COMPRENANT DES DONNÉES POUR ACHEMINER DES VÉHICULES AÉRIENS PENDANT LA DÉFAILLANCE D'UN GNSS[2022/33]
Former [2022/33]KARTE, DIE DATEN FÜR DIE LOKALISIERUNG VON FLUGZEUGEN BEI AUSFALL DES GNSS EINSCHLIESST
Entry into regional phase29.04.2022National basic fee paid 
29.04.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2022Examination requested  [2022/33]
29.04.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.11.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2024Fee for grant paid
21.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2016371985  (KOTECHA LALIT R [US]) [A] 1,3,8* paragraph [0013] *;
 [A]US2017328716  (MA YUNQIAN [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [X]US2019080142  (ABEYWARDENA DINUKA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0033]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0127] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.