EP4244443 - JOINT STRIP FOR REINFORCEMENT OF DRYWALL PANEL JOINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Gips KG Am Bahnhof 7 97346 Iphofen / DE | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERSCHBAUM, Alexander 91628 Steinsfeld / DE | 02 /
WIECZOREK, Thomas 97350 Mainbernheim / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 20816407.9 | 16.11.2020 | [2023/38] | WO2020EP00194 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022100809 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4244443 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/04, E04F13/06, E04F21/165 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
E04F13/042 (EP,US);
E04F13/068 (EP,US);
E04F21/1655 (EP,US);
E04F2013/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSTREIFEN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG VON TROCKENWANDPLATTENVERBINDUNGEN | [2023/38] | English: | JOINT STRIP FOR REINFORCEMENT OF DRYWALL PANEL JOINTS | [2023/38] | French: | BANDE DE JOINT POUR LE RENFORCEMENT DE JOINTS DE PANNEAUX DE CLOISON SÈCHE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 20.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE4128810 (GIMA GIPSER UND MALERBEDARF GM [DE]) [X] 1-5,10-14 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 16 - line 21 * * column 5, line 12 - line 40 * * column 5, line 57 - line 66 * [Y] 6-9,15; | [Y]US2017037638 (GOMES HAROLD FURTADO [US]) [Y] 6-9,15 * figures 7, 9, 14-16 * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0081] ** paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0117] * |