blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3946667

EP3946667 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING PLASTIC WASTE PYROLYSIS GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.12.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.01.2022
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.12.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neste Oyj
Keilaranta 21
02150 Espoo / FI
[2022/06]
Inventor(s)01 / KURKIJÄRVI, Antti
c/o Neste Oyj
IPR,
P.O. Box 310
06101 Porvoo / FI
02 / LEHTINEN, Hannu
c/o Neste Oyj
IPR,
P.O. Box 310
06101 Porvoo / FI
03 / KORHONEN, Esa
c/o Neste Oyj
IPR,
P.O. Box 310
06101 Porvoo / FI
04 / MATILAINEN, Mikko
c/o Neste Oyj
IPR,
P.O. Box 310
06101 Porvoo / FI
05 / NYSTRÖM, Max
c/o Neste Oyj
IPR,
P.O. Box 310
06101 Porvoo / FI
 [2024/13]
Former [2022/06]01 / KURKIJÄRVI, Antti
06101 Porvoo / FI
02 / LEHTINEN, Hannu
06101 Porvoo / FI
03 / KORHONEN, Esa
06101 Porvoo / FI
04 / MATILAINEN, Mikko
06101 Porvoo / FI
05 / NYSTRÖM, Max
06101 Porvoo / FI
Representative(s)Hovinen, Jari Juhani
Finnpatent Oy
Smart Chemistry Park
Raisionkaari 55
21200 Raisio / FI
[2022/06]
Application number, filing date20822331.301.06.2020
[2022/06]
WO2020FI50369
Priority number, dateFI2019000549310.06.2019         Original published format: FI 20195493
[2022/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020249853
Date:17.12.2020
Language:EN
[2020/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3946667
Date:09.02.2022
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3946667
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI17.12.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2022
ClassificationIPC:B01D5/00, B01D53/00, C10G1/10, F28F19/00, C10K1/04, // C10B53/07, C10G75/00
[2022/19]
CPC:
C10G1/10 (EP,US); B01D3/00 (FI,US); B01D53/002 (EP,FI,US);
B01D5/0036 (EP,US); C10B53/07 (EP,FI,US); C10G1/00 (FI);
C10G5/06 (US); C10G70/06 (US); C10G75/00 (EP,US);
C10K1/04 (EP); B01D2257/70 (EP,US); B01D2258/0291 (US);
C10G2300/1003 (EP,US); Y02P20/143 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2022/06]B01D3/00, B01D53/00, C10B53/07, C10G1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON PYROLYSEGAS AUS KUNSTSTOFFABFÄLLEN[2022/06]
English:METHOD FOR PROCESSING PLASTIC WASTE PYROLYSIS GAS[2022/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ DE PYROLYSE DE DÉCHETS PLASTIQUES[2022/06]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2021National basic fee paid 
27.10.2021Search fee paid 
27.10.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2021Examination requested  [2022/06]
11.05.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2024Fee for grant paid
16.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4591366  (WOHNER HANS J [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * columns 2-4 * [I] 3;
 [A]JPH07216363  (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0 15] , [0 16] , [0 24] ** figure 1 *
International search[A]US3663645  (DORN ROLF K, et al) [A] 1-8 * Column 2, lines 49-63; column 3, lines 8-19; column 6, lines 41-45; Figures 1-3; Table; Claims; Example in Table *;
 [A]US5092981  (RUSSO GAETANO [AU]) [A] 1-8 * Column 3, lines 7-61; Figures 1-4, Claims 1-5 *;
 [A]JP2006321851  (MITSUMINE KOGYO KK) [A] 1-8;
 [AD]EP3031881  (INNORD SP Z O O S K A [PL]) [AD] 1-8* Paragraph [0049]; Figure 1; Claims 1, 2, 4, and 5 *;
 [A]US2018030356  (FREEL BARRY A [CA]) [A] 1-8 * Figure 1; Claims 21, 24, 25-27, and 34-37 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.