EP4043597 - FERRITIC STAINLESS STEEL SHEET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND FERRITIC STAINLESS STEEL MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL Stainless Steel Corporation 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Kou c/o NIPPON STEEL STAINLESS STEEL CORPORATION 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Yoshiharu c/o NIPPON STEEL STAINLESS STEEL CORPORATION 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20871144.0 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020JP36379 | Priority number, date | JP20190182231 | 02.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019182231 | [2022/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021065738 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043597 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/48, C22C38/00, C22C38/28, C22C38/04, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/06, C22C38/32, C22C38/48, C22C38/50, C22C38/30, C22C38/22, C22C38/16, C22C38/02, C21D1/26, C22C38/60, C21D8/04, C21D6/00 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
C21D6/002 (EP);
C22C38/44 (CN,KR);
C22C38/004 (EP,CN);
C22C38/60 (EP,CN,US);
C21D1/26 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (CN);
C21D8/0226 (CN,KR,US);
C21D8/0236 (CN,KR,US);
C21D8/0273 (CN,KR);
C21D8/0436 (EP);
C21D8/0463 (EP);
C21D8/0473 (EP);
C21D9/48 (EP,KR);
C22C38/001 (CN,KR);
C22C38/002 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/008 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN);
C22C38/06 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/105 (US);
C22C38/12 (US);
C22C38/14 (US);
C22C38/16 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C22C38/24 (EP);
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/28 (EP);
C22C38/30 (EP);
C22C38/32 (EP);
C22C38/42 (CN,KR);
C22C38/46 (CN,KR);
C22C38/48 (EP,CN);
C22C38/50 (EP,CN);
C22C38/52 (CN);
C22C38/54 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | C21D9/48, C22C38/00, C22C38/28, C22C38/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | FERRITISCHES EDELSTAHLBLECH, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND TEIL AUS FERRITISCHEM EDELSTAHL | [2022/33] | English: | FERRITIC STAINLESS STEEL SHEET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND FERRITIC STAINLESS STEEL MEMBER | [2022/33] | French: | TÔLE EN ACIER INOXYDABLE FERRITIQUE, PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUIRE ET ÉLÉMENT D'ACIER INOXYDABLE FERRITIQUE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2022 | Translation filed | 02.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 03.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013008573 (HAMADA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y]US2013149187 (INOUE YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 47]; examples 5, 6; table 1 *; | [Y]JP2019002053 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN SST) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0084] , [0 98] - [0105]; claims 1, 8 * | International search | [A]JPH06179921 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-8 * , claims, paragraph [0010], tables 1, 2 *; | [A]JP2002285300 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-8 * , claims, paragraphs [0041]-[0043], tables 1-4 *; | [A]JP2006193771 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN SST) [A] 1-8 * , claims, paragraph [0035], tables 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2016068139 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN SST [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , claims, paragraphs [0067], [0068], tables 1-1 to 4-3 *; | [A]JP2019002053 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN SST) [A] 1-8 * , claims, paragraphs [0048], [0104], [0108], tables 1-4 *; | [PX]WO2019189872 (NIPPON STEEL STAINLESS STEEL CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-8* , claims, paragraph [0072], tables 1-3 * | by applicant | JP2000265215 | JP2003138349 | JP2005105347 |