blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4032611

EP4032611 - COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND USE THEREOF IN DESULFURIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.06.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.04.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2023New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
China Petroleum & Chemical Corporation
22 Chaoyangmen North Street Chaoyang District
Beijing 100728 / CN
For all designated states
Sinopec Qilu Company
No.15 Huangong Road, Linzi District
Zibo, Shandong 255400 / CN
[2022/30]
Inventor(s)01 / XU, Cuicui
No.15 Huangong Road, Linzi District
Zibo, Shandong 255400 / CN
02 / LIU, Aihua
No.15 Huangong Road, Linzi District
Zibo, Shandong 255400 / CN
03 / HAN, Feng
No.15 Huangong Road, Linzi District
Zibo, Shandong 255400 / CN
04 / LIU, Jianli
No.15 Huangong Road, Linzi District
Zibo, Shandong 255400 / CN
05 / LIU, Zengrang
No.15 Huangong Road, Linzi District
Zibo, Shandong 255400 / CN
06 / TAO, Weidong
No.15 Huangong Road, Linzi District
Zibo, Shandong 255400 / CN
07 / CHANG, Wenzhi
No.15 Huangong Road, Linzi District
Zibo, Shandong 255400 / CN
08 / LYU, Caishan
No.15 Huangong Road, Linzi District
Zibo, Shandong 255400 / CN
 [2022/30]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2022/30]
Application number, filing date20874815.224.07.2020
[2022/30]
WO2020CN104502
Priority number, dateCN20191096250811.10.2019         Original published format: CN201910962508
[2022/30]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021068599
Date:15.04.2021
Language:ZH
[2021/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4032611
Date:27.07.2022
Language:EN
[2022/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.04.2021
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2022
ClassificationIPC:B01J23/78, B01J23/83, B01J21/18, B01J21/08, B01D53/48
[2022/30]
CPC:
F23G7/06 (EP,CN); B01J20/20 (EP,CN,US); B01D53/02 (EP,CN);
B01D53/0423 (US); B01D53/48 (CN); B01D53/50 (CN);
B01D53/508 (EP,US); B01D53/75 (EP,CN,US); B01D53/82 (EP,US);
B01D53/96 (US); B01J20/041 (EP,CN,US); B01J20/06 (EP,CN);
B01J20/103 (EP,CN,US); B01J20/2803 (EP); B01J20/28057 (EP);
B01J20/28064 (US); B01J20/28071 (US); B01J20/2808 (EP,US);
B01J20/28083 (EP,US); B01J20/28092 (EP,US); B01J20/3007 (EP);
B01J20/3014 (EP); B01J20/3064 (EP); B01J20/3078 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP); B01J20/3236 (EP); B01J21/08 (EP);
B01J21/18 (EP); B01J23/83 (EP); B01J35/60 (EP);
B01J35/617 (EP); B01J35/63 (EP); B01J35/633 (EP);
B01J35/64 (EP); B01J37/0009 (EP); B01J37/0018 (EP);
B01J37/0201 (EP); B01J37/0207 (EP); B01J37/04 (EP);
B01J37/082 (EP); B01J37/088 (EP); C01B17/04 (CN);
C01B17/16 (CN); C01B17/164 (CN,US); C01B17/167 (EP);
C01B17/508 (US); C01B17/56 (EP); F23G7/07 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP,CN,US); B01D2253/106 (EP,US); B01D2253/1124 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/25 (EP,US); B01D2253/308 (US); B01D2253/31 (US);
B01D2253/311 (US); B01D2257/302 (EP,CN,US); B01D2258/0283 (EP,CN);
B01D2259/4009 (US); B01J2220/42 (CN); B01J2220/4806 (CN);
B01J23/78 (EP); F23G2209/14 (CN); F23J2215/20 (EP);
F23J2219/30 (EP); Y02A50/20 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/30]
TitleGerman:VERBUNDMATERIAL UND SEINE VERWENDUNG BEI DER ENTSCHWEFELUNG[2022/30]
English:COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND USE THEREOF IN DESULFURIZATION[2022/30]
French:MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE ET SON UTILISATION DANS LA DÉSULFURATION[2022/30]
Entry into regional phase21.04.2022Translation filed 
21.04.2022National basic fee paid 
21.04.2022Search fee paid 
21.04.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.2022Examination requested  [2022/30]
24.05.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005020445  (CHOUDHARY TUSHAR V [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0087] ** claims 16,17,20,22,36,47 *;
 [A]WO2007072440  (FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 43,44,46-50 * * paragraph [0055] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.