EP4046230 - ELECTRONICS ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Relectrify Holdings Pty 4/113-117 Adderley Street West Melbourne, Victoria 3003 / AU | [2024/13] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states Relectrify Holdings Pty 29 Grosvenor St Abbotsford, Victoria 3067 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROWLEY, Daniel Christopher c/o Relectrify Holdings PTY 115 Whiteman Street Southbank Melbourne, Victoria 3006 / AU | 02 /
SHOEIBY, Babak c/o Relectrify Holdings PTY 115 Whiteman Street Southbank Melbourne, Victoria 3006 / AU | 03 /
PRAZERES, Jose Ralino Elias Gomes c/o Relectrify Holdings PTY 115 Whiteman Street Southbank Melbourne, Victoria 3006 / AU | 04 /
JAHSHAN, David Elias c/o Relectrify Holdings PTY 115 Whiteman Street Southbank Melbourne, Victoria 3006 / AU | 05 /
CAPLES, Miles c/o Relectrify Holdings PTY 115 Whiteman Street Southbank Melbourne, Victoria 3006 / AU | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Porta & Consulenti Associati S.p.A. Via Vittoria Colonna, 4 20149 Milano / IT | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20875938.1 | 16.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020AU51112 | Priority number, date | AU20190903898 | 16.10.2019 Original published format: AU 2019903898 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021072497 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046230 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/00, H05K3/10, H05K1/00 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H05K1/189 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/01 (AU);
H01M50/507 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/519 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/49838 (KR);
H01L23/4985 (KR);
H01L23/5387 (AU,KR);
H01L23/62 (KR);
H01L24/04 (KR);
H01L24/07 (KR);
H01M10/425 (AU,KR);
H01M50/524 (EP,KR);
H01M50/526 (EP,KR);
H01M50/528 (KR,US);
H01M50/574 (EP,KR);
H01M50/583 (KR);
H05K3/4691 (EP,KR);
H01L23/4006 (AU);
H01L2924/14 (AU,KR);
H01L2924/351 (AU,US);
H01M2010/4271 (AU);
H01M2200/103 (EP);
H01M50/00 (AU);
H05K1/0277 (EP,AU);
H05K1/0283 (AU);
H05K1/147 (AU);
H05K2201/10037 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONIKBAUGRUPPE | [2022/34] | English: | ELECTRONICS ASSEMBLY | [2022/34] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 11.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017077487 (COAKLEY KEVIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0138] *[I] 2-22 | International search | [X]US2010271223 (OHKURA KAZUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-23 * See whole document, in particular: Abstract; Paras. [0008]-[0021], [0042]-[0049], [0063]-[0064], [0068]-[0069], [0076]-[0078], [0082]-[0087], [0108]-[0109], [0119]-[0124]; Figs. 1-14. *; | [A]US8507122 (SAITO MASAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-23* See whole document. *; | [X]US2014370343 (NOMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-23 * See whole document, in particular: Abstract; Paras. [0005], [0057]-[0059], [0062]-[0071], [0079], [0084], [0087]-[0097], [0103], [0116]-[0118], [0126]-[0131], [0149], [0151]; Figs. 1-8. *; | [X]US9024572 (NISHIHARA YOSHITOMO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-6, 8-14, 18, 20 * See whole document, in particular: Abstract; Col. 8 line 1 to Col. 10 line 67; Figs. 1-56. * |