blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4041451

EP4041451 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING QUINONE AND/OR QUINOL AND METHODS OF PREPARATIONS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.07.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.04.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2024Supplementary search reportpublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
American River Nutrition, LLC
333 Venture Way
Hadley, MA 01035 / US
[2022/33]
Inventor(s)01 / TAN, Barrie
333 Venture Way
Hadley, Massachusetts 01035 / US
 [2022/33]
Representative(s)Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2022/33]
Application number, filing date20877280.616.10.2020
[2022/33]
WO2020US55917
Priority number, dateUS201962915649P16.10.2019         Original published format: US 201962915649 P
[2022/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021076847
Date:22.04.2021
Language:EN
[2021/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4041451
Date:17.08.2022
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.04.2021
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2024
ClassificationIPC:C07C37/07, C07C39/23, C07C41/26, C07C43/23, C07C45/62, C07C49/255, A61K9/00, A61K31/09, A61K31/12, C07D311/72, C07D471/04
[2023/46]
CPC:
A61K31/12 (EP,US); A61K31/09 (EP,US); A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/0053 (US); C07C37/07 (EP); C07C41/26 (EP);
C07C45/62 (EP); C07D311/72 (EP); C07D471/04 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C07C37/07, C07C39/23 (EP);
C07C41/26, C07C43/23 (EP);
C07C45/62, C07C49/255 (EP)
Former IPC [2022/33]B01J31/02, C01C1/20, C01C1/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/33]
Extension statesBA11.05.2022
ME11.05.2022
Validation statesKH11.05.2022
MA11.05.2022
MD11.05.2022
TN11.05.2022
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT CHINON UND/ODER CHINOL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG[2022/33]
English:COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING QUINONE AND/OR QUINOL AND METHODS OF PREPARATIONS AND USE THEREOF[2022/33]
French:COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DE LA QUINONE ET/OU DU QUINOL ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET D'UTILISATION[2022/33]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2022National basic fee paid 
11.05.2022Search fee paid 
11.05.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2022Examination requested  [2022/33]
02.12.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]KR20130010649  (UNIV HALLYM IACF [KR]) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0006]; claim 1 * [A] 2-5,12,14,15 [I] 6,7,10,11,13;
 [I]US2013142767  (YAMAGUCHI TAKAO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15* Claims; paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048]; examples 1,3-5,8,9 *
International search[A]WO2012021394  (NOVOZYMES INC [US], et al) [A] 1* entire document *;
 [Y]KR20130010649  (UNIV HALLYM IACF [KR]) [Y] 1 * see machine translation *;
 [Y]WO2018160618  (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 1 * entire document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.