blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4044277

EP4044277 - METHOD OF PREPARING NEGATIVE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2022/33]METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING NEGATIVE ELECTRODE
[2023/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.07.2022
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.05.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD.
Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07335 / KR
[2022/33]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAE, Oh Byong
LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
02 / KIM, Ye Ri
LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
03 / LEE, Su Yeon
LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
04 / HWANG, Seung Hae
LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
 [2022/33]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2022/33]
Application number, filing date20881012.730.10.2020
[2022/33]
WO2020KR15078
Priority number, dateKR2019013887301.11.2019         Original published format: KR 20190138873
[2022/33]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021086132
Date:06.05.2021
Language:KO
[2021/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4044277
Date:17.08.2022
Language:EN
[2022/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4044277
Date:21.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.05.2021
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2023
ClassificationIPC:H01M4/139, H01M4/04, H01M10/052, H01M4/02, H01M4/1393, H01M4/36, H01M4/134, H01M4/1395, H01M4/38
[2023/43]
CPC:
H01M4/134 (EP); H01M4/139 (CN,KR); H01M10/446 (CN);
H01M4/0416 (US); H01M10/052 (EP,CN,KR); H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M4/0404 (US); H01M4/0445 (KR); H01M4/0459 (KR);
H01M4/0471 (CN,KR); H01M4/1395 (EP); H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M4/667 (US); H01M2004/027 (EP,CN,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2023/18]H01M4/139, H01M4/04, H01M10/052, H01M4/02, H01M4/1393, H01M4/36
Former IPC [2022/33]H01M4/139, H01M4/04, H01M10/052, H01M4/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER NEGATIVELEKTRODE[2022/33]
English:METHOD OF PREPARING NEGATIVE ELECTRODE[2023/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE[2022/33]
Former [2022/33]METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING NEGATIVE ELECTRODE
Entry into regional phase13.04.2022Translation filed 
13.04.2022National basic fee paid 
13.04.2022Search fee paid 
13.04.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2022Examination requested  [2022/33]
19.05.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2024Fee for grant paid
15.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2013302688  (TAKEZAWA HIDEHARU [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0082] , [0156] , [0239] - [0241] - [0259] - [0261] *;
 [A]WO2019070896  (IOXUS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [1063] - [1064] *;
 [A]KR20190101807  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0122] - [0131] *
International search[Y]US2016181594  (BALOGH MICHAEL P [US], et al) [Y] 10,11 * See claim 1; and paragraph [0058]. *;
 [Y]WO2019070896  (IOXUS INC [US]) [Y] 2,9 * See claims 1, 4, 10-12, 23 and 24; the examples. *;
 [Y]KR20190090723  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,2,7-11 * See claim 1; and paragraphs [0074] and [0113]-[0115]. *;
 [A]KR20190106772  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1,2,7-11* See entire document. *;
 [YA]  - Yusuke Abe, Tomoaki Saito, Seiji Kumagai, "Effect of Prelithiation Process for Hard Carbon Negative Electrode on the Rate and Cycling Behaviors of Lithium-Ion Batteries", Batteries, (20181212), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.3390/batteries4040071, pages 1 - 16, XP055728029 [Y] 1,7,8,10,11 * See 2.2. Lithium Nickel Cobalt Manganese Oxide (NCM)/Li and Hard Carbon (HC)/Li Half-Cells Assembly section; 2.3. Prelithiation Processes and the NCM/HC Full-Cell Assembly section; and figure 1. * [A] 2,9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/batteries4040071
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.