EP4052863 - METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR FRICTION OF MULTI-DEGREE-OF-FREEDOM COOPERATIVE ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neuromeka 1501-1506, W-dong, 7, Yeonmujang 5ga-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04782 / KR | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jong Hoon 601-1104, 7, Migeum-ro 189beon-gil Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12250 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Woong Yong 5-406, 77, Cheongam-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37673 / KR | 03 /
HEO, Young Jin 106-601, 219, Oedongballim-ro, Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 51425 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Gwan Woo 206, 35, Hyojadong-gil 10beon-gil, Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37664 / KR | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20883155.2 | 30.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020KR15022 | Priority number, date | KR20190138394 | 01.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20190138394 | KR20200131103 | 01.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20200131103 | [2022/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021086106 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4052863 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
B25J9/1641 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/1664 (KR,US);
B25J9/1692 (KR,US);
G05B2219/37373 (EP);
G05B2219/39181 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION DER REIBUNG EINES KOOPERATIVEN ROBOTERS MIT MEHREREN FREIHEITSGRADEN | [2022/36] | English: | METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR FRICTION OF MULTI-DEGREE-OF-FREEDOM COOPERATIVE ROBOT | [2022/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMPENSATION DU FROTTEMENT D'UN ROBOT COOPÉRATIF À DEGRÉS DE LIBERTÉ MULTIPLES | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2022 | Translation filed | 19.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20150093039 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0045]; figure 2 *; | [XI]WO2019063146 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [X] 1,5,6 * page 2 * * page 11 - page 15 * [I] 9; | [XI] - KERMANI M R ET AL, "Friction identification in robotic manipulators: case studies", CONTROL APPLICATIONS, 2005. CCA 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF 2005 IEEE CONFERE NCE ON TORONTO, CANADA AUG. 29-31, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050829), ISBN 978-0-7803-9354-7, pages 1170 - 1175, XP010835249 [X] 1,4,6-8,10 * page 1170 - page 1175 * [I] 2,3,11 | [A] - ISKANDAR MAGED ET AL, "Dynamic friction model with thermal and load dependency: modeling, compensation, and external force estimation", 2019 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA), IEEE, (20190520), doi:10.1109/ICRA.2019.8794406, pages 7367 - 7373, XP033594334 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICRA.2019.8794406 | International search | [A]KR101369286B (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [A] 1-11 * See paragraphs [0037], [0038], [0046] and [0050] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]KR20150093039 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 7; | [Y]KR20150141246 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [Y] 2-4 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0017] and [0052]-[0077]. *; | [A]US2018354135 (CARLISLE BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * See paragraphs [0007], [0052], [0055] and [0056] and figures 5 and 6. *; | [A]KR20190032280 (KASTANIENBAUM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * See paragraphs [0008], [0029], [0035] and [0056] and figure 2. *; | [PX]KR102170591B (NEUROMEKA CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-11 * See claims 1 and 10-11. ** (* This document is the published patent of a earlier application that serves as a basis for claiming priority of the present international application.) * |