EP4050781 - PRE-CHARGING CIRCUIT, INVERTER AND POWER GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518043 / CN | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yanzhong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YE, Haijun Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YAO, Xiaofeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20890634.7 | 16.06.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020CN96377 | Priority number, date | CN201911158858 | 22.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911158858 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021098201 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050781 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/32, H02M1/36, // H02M7/12, H02M7/48 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H02M1/36 (EP,CN);
H02J7/35 (US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02M7/44 (US);
H02J2207/20 (US);
H02J2207/50 (EP,US);
H02J2300/22 (EP);
H02J2300/24 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | H02M1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | VORLADESCHALTUNG, WECHSELRICHTER UND STROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/35] | English: | PRE-CHARGING CIRCUIT, INVERTER AND POWER GENERATION SYSTEM | [2022/35] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PRÉCHARGE, ONDULEUR ET SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | Translation filed | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 22.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0477367 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11* figure 1 *; | [I]JPH04161097 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [I] 1-11 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]WO2008066000 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* entire document *; | [Y]CN102484372 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-11 * description, paragraphs [0034]-[0040], and figures 2-6 *; | [A]CN103814514 (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [Y]CN104967300 (SUNGROW POWER SUPPLY CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * description, paragraphs [0036]-[0082], and figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN207124475U (BEIJING ETECHWIN ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [PX]CN110994968 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-11 * description, paragraphs [0001]-[0066], and figures 1-15 * |