blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3931778

EP3931778 - PERSONAL INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER-READABLE NON-TRANSITORY MEDIUM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.12.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.07.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 07.02.2024  [2024/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SNPLAB INC.
Hanyang Institute of Technology
222, Wangsimni-ro
Seongdong-gu
Seoul 04763 / KR
[2022/01]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Jae Young
105-105, 120, Irwon-ro, Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06356 / KR
 [2024/06]
Former [2022/01]01 / LEE, Jae Young
Seoul 06356 / KR
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth
Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2022/01]
Application number, filing date20912744.818.11.2020
[2022/01]
WO2020KR16302
Priority number, dateKR2020000159506.01.2020         Original published format: KR 20200001595
KR2020002547228.02.2020         Original published format: KR 20200025472
[2022/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021141235
Date:15.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3931778
Date:05.01.2022
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3931778
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.07.2021
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2022
ClassificationIPC:G06Q10/10, H04L9/00, G06F3/0488, G06F3/04847, G06F21/64, G06F21/62
[2023/37]
CPC:
G06F21/64 (EP,CN); G06Q10/04 (KR); G06Q20/382 (CN);
G06F21/6245 (US); G06F16/27 (CN); G06F21/602 (CN);
G06F21/6254 (EP); G06F3/0482 (US); G06F3/04847 (EP);
G06F3/0488 (EP); G06F3/04883 (US); G06Q10/10 (KR);
G06Q20/065 (CN); G06Q20/10 (CN); G06Q40/00 (KR);
G06Q40/04 (CN); H04L9/50 (EP); G06F2221/2113 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2022/49]G06Q10/10, H04L9/00
Former IPC [2022/01]G06Q10/10, H04L29/08, H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG PERSÖNLICHER INFORMATIONEN SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES NICHTFLÜCHTIGES MEDIUM DAFÜR[2022/01]
English:PERSONAL INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER-READABLE NON-TRANSITORY MEDIUM THEREFOR[2022/01]
French:DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS PERSONNELLES, ET SUPPORT NON TRANSITOIRE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉ[2022/01]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2021National basic fee paid 
01.10.2021Search fee paid 
01.10.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2021Examination requested  [2022/01]
22.05.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2023Fee for grant paid
27.12.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.12.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010088743  (HAYASHIDA NAOKO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] *;
 [A]US2018307859  (LAFEVER MALCOLM GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0374] *;
 [XAI]WO2019089044  (VISA INT SERVICE CORPORATION [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * Passages are specified in respect to US family member. * [A] 5,12 [I] 15;
 [P]US2020311299  (AMAR SUMIT [US]) [P] * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0078] *
International search[Y]KR20100060130  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0023] and claims 1-2. *;
 [Y]US2010306834  (GRANDISON TYRONE W A [US], et al) [Y] 15 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0040],[0044]-[0046] and claims 1,7. *;
 [A]US2013185206  (LEGGETT JACQUELLE DEQUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0023]-[0027] and claims 1,6. *;
 [Y]WO2018049318  (SENSORIANT INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0165],[0228],[0274]. *;
 [A]KR20200000161  (BLOCK CHAIN SECURITY COOP [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0022] and claim 1. *
by applicantUS2020311299
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.