blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3848559

EP3848559 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE INCLUDING SQUEEZE FILM DAMPER WITH RESERVOIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.09.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.01.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.06.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 28.02.2024  [2024/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RTX Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2023/44]
Former [2021/28]For all designated states
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AMADOR, Armando
55 Darwell Drive
Wethersfield, CT 06109 / US
02 / BORATGIS, Ernest
70 Stonefield Trail
South Windsor, CT 06074 / US
 [2023/41]
Former [2021/28]01 / AMADOR, Armando
55 Darwell Drive
Wethersfield, CT Connecticut 06109 / US
02 / BORATGIS, Ernest
70 Stonefield Trail
South Windsor, CT Connecticut 06074 / US
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2021/28]
Application number, filing date21150215.805.01.2021
[2021/28]
Priority number, dateUS20201673628107.01.2020         Original published format: US202016736281
[2021/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3848559
Date:14.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3848559
Date:28.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2021
ClassificationIPC:F01D25/16, F16C27/04, F16F15/023
[2021/28]
CPC:
F01D25/164 (EP,US); F02C7/06 (US); F01D25/18 (US);
F01D25/20 (US); F01D25/22 (US); F01D9/065 (US);
F16C27/045 (EP,US); F16C33/74 (EP); F16F15/0237 (EP,US);
F05D2220/323 (US); F05D2220/40 (US); F05D2240/50 (US);
F05D2240/55 (US); F05D2240/60 (US); F05D2260/40311 (US);
F05D2260/96 (US); F05D2260/98 (US); F16C2360/23 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/07]
Former [2021/28]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK MIT QUETSCHFILMDÄMPFER MIT RESERVOIR[2021/28]
English:GAS TURBINE ENGINE INCLUDING SQUEEZE FILM DAMPER WITH RESERVOIR[2021/28]
French:MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ COMPORTANT UN AMORTISSEUR À FILM COMPRIMÉ AVEC RÉSERVOIR[2021/28]
Examination procedure12.01.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2022Examination requested  [2022/07]
12.01.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2024Fee for grant paid
18.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US4782919  (CHALAIRE DONALD K [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 9 - line 14 * * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 64 * [A] 3-6 [I] 9-12;
 [XAI]US5067825  (VANCE JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13,15 * abstract * [A] 3,6 [I] 9-12,14;
 [A]US2018274588  (HUDSON DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0024] *;
 [XAI]FR3069571  (SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES [FR]) [X] 1-3,7,8,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 4-6 [I] 9-12,14
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.