blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3871604

EP3871604 - RETRACTABLE DETECTOR ARM FOR INTERVENTIONAL C-ARM IMAGING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.12.2021
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.07.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2021Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.01.2022  [2022/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Precision Healthcare LLC
9900 W. Innovation Drive
RP 2131
Wauwatosa, WI 53226 / US
[2021/35]
Inventor(s)01 / YESUDHAS, Jabez Augustine
9900 W. Innovation Drive
Wauwatosa, WI 53226 / US
 [2021/35]
Representative(s)Fennell, Gareth Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2021/35]
Application number, filing date21158515.322.02.2021
[2021/35]
Priority number, dateUS20201680166026.02.2020         Original published format: US202016801660
[2021/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3871604
Date:01.09.2021
Language:EN
[2021/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2021
ClassificationIPC:A61B6/00
[2021/35]
CPC:
A61B6/4441 (EP,CN,US); A61B6/4452 (US); A61B6/4458 (EP);
A61B6/4476 (US); A61B6/587 (EP); A61B6/588 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINZIEHBARER DETEKTORARM FÜR INTERVENTIONELLE C-ARM-BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEME[2021/35]
English:RETRACTABLE DETECTOR ARM FOR INTERVENTIONAL C-ARM IMAGING SYSTEMS[2021/35]
French:BRAS DÉTECTEUR RÉTRACTABLE POUR SYSTÈMES D'IMAGERIE INTERVENTIONNELLE À BRAS EN C[2021/35]
Examination procedure22.02.2021Examination requested  [2021/35]
15.12.2021Application withdrawn by applicant  [2022/04]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2001340322  (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [X] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021]; figure - *;
 [XAY]US2010006727  (BOOMGAARDEN JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0032]; figure - * [A] 5-7 [Y] 11;
 [XY]US2007081632  (FADLER FRANZ [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0037]; figure - * [Y] 11;
 [XYI]US2009180594  (SALADIN JEAN PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,5,7-9,13-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0054]; figure - * [Y] 11 [I] 10;
 [XYI]US2010303207  (TSUJII OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,9,12 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0102]; figure - * [Y] 11 [I] 10;
 [X]EP3610795  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,8,13-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0037]; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.