EP3919414 - AUTOMATED SHUTTLE SYSTEMS FOR MULTI-DEPTH STORAGE RACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligrated Headquarters LLC 7901 Innovation Way Mason, OH 45040 / US | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANJITH KUMAR, Krishna Praveen Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 02 /
GUDI, Srinivasa Rao Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 03 /
URUKONDA, Santhosh Kumar Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21160553.0 | 03.03.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | IN202011011218 | 16.03.2020 Original published format: IN202011011218 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919414 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B65G1/06 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
B65G1/0492 (EP,CN,US);
B65G1/065 (EP,US);
B65G1/1373 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE SHUTTLESYSTEME FÜR LAGERREGALE MIT MEHREREN TIEFEN | [2021/49] | English: | AUTOMATED SHUTTLE SYSTEMS FOR MULTI-DEPTH STORAGE RACKS | [2021/49] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE NAVETTE AUTOMATIQUE POUR RÂTELIER DE STOCKAGE À PROFONDEURS MULTIPLES | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 26.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4400829 (TGW TRANSPORTGERAETE GMBH [AT]); | [XY]EP0733563 (TOYO KANETSU KK [JP]); | [XY]DE102006049411 (PSB INTRALOGISTICS GMBH [DE]); | [XY]DE102011002322 (LANG HARTMUT [DE], et al); | [XY]US2015259141 (YAMADA FUMIE [JP]) |