EP3882453 - DOUBLE-FLOW TURBOREACTOR CONTAINING A SERIES OF ROTATING BLADES TO CLOSE THE SECONDARY FLOW CHANNEL AND BYPASS THE AIR FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/38] | DUAL-FLOW TURBOJET ENGINE COMPRISING A SERIES OF ROTARY STRIPS FOR BLOCKING THE SECONDARY FLOW STREAM AND DIVERTING THE AIR FLOW | ||
[2022/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS (S.A.S.) 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDES, Pascal C/O AIRBUS OPERATIONS (S.A.S.) 316, route de Bayonne 31060 TOULOUSE Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
MENOU, Fabien C/O AIRBUS OPERATIONS (S.A.S.) 316, route de Bayonne 31060 TOULOUSE Cedex 9 / FR | 03 /
GOUGEON, Pascal C/O AIRBUS OPERATIONS (S.A.S.) 316, route de Bayonne 31060 TOULOUSE Cedex 9 / FR | 04 /
VANDERBAUWEDE, Simon C/O AIRBUS OPERATIONS (S.A.S.) 316, route de Bayonne 31060 TOULOUSE Cedex 9 / FR | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Sarraméa, Claude Boîte Postale B03-2A1 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 21162153.7 | 11.03.2021 | [2021/38] | Priority number, date | FR20200002535 | 16.03.2020 Original published format: FR 2002535 | [2021/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882453 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3882453 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/72 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
F02K1/72 (EP,US);
B64D29/02 (CN);
F02C6/206 (US);
F02C9/18 (US);
F02K1/64 (US);
F02K1/70 (US);
F04D29/524 (US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2240/129 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZWEIFLUTIGER TURBOREAKTOR MIT EINER REIHE DREHBLÄTTERN, UM DEN SEKUNDÄRDURCHFLUSSKANAL ZU SCHLIESSEN UND DEN LUFTDURCHFLUSS UMZULEITEN | [2022/10] | English: | DOUBLE-FLOW TURBOREACTOR CONTAINING A SERIES OF ROTATING BLADES TO CLOSE THE SECONDARY FLOW CHANNEL AND BYPASS THE AIR FLOW | [2022/10] | French: | TURBOREACTEUR DOUBLE FLUX COMPORTANT UNE SERIE DE LAMES ROTATIVES POUR OBTURER LA VEINE DU FLUX SECONDAIRE ET DEVIER LE FLUX D'AIR | [2021/38] |
Former [2021/38] | DOPPELFLUSS-TURBOTRIEBWERK, DAS EINE REIHE VON SICH DREHENDEN SCHAUFELBLÄTTERN UMFASST, UM DEN KANAL DES SEKUNDÄRFLUSSES ABZUDICHTEN UND DEN LUFTSTROM UMZULEITEN | ||
Former [2021/38] | DUAL-FLOW TURBOJET ENGINE COMPRISING A SERIES OF ROTARY STRIPS FOR BLOCKING THE SECONDARY FLOW STREAM AND DIVERTING THE AIR FLOW | Examination procedure | 11.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 30.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | IT | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2933890 (MORRISON JOHN A) [A] 1-4* figure - *; | [A]US4026105 (JAMES VARNELL L) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,2,4,9a,9b,12 *; | [A]US4030290 (STACHOWIAK CLAUDE R) [A] 1-4 * figures 2,6 *; | [A]EP3540203 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]) [A] 1-4 * figure - * | by applicant | FR3078999 |