blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3855647

EP3855647 - OPTICAL TRANSMITTER, OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND OPTICAL COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.10.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.01.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.06.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2024Correction of patent specificationpublished on 01.05.2024  [2024/18]
29.03.2024Change - applicantpublished on 01.05.2024  [2024/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Asia Pacific Pte Ltd.
80 Bendemeer Road 05-01/02
Singapore 339949 / SG
[2024/18]
Former [2023/42]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Former [2021/30]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
108-8001 Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ABE, Junichi
c/o NEC CORPORATION
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Tatsuya
c/o NEC CORPORATION
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
 [2021/30]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
P.O. Box 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2024/13]Brevalex
Tour Trinity
1 B Place de la Défense
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Former [2021/30]Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
Application number, filing date21162232.905.10.2015
[2021/30]
Priority number, dateJP2014020934610.10.2014         Original published format: JP 2014209346
JP2015008833423.04.2015         Original published format: JP 2015088334
[2021/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3855647
Date:28.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3855647
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP3855647
Date:01.05.2024
[2024/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2021
ClassificationIPC:H04B10/516, H04L27/36, H04L27/38, H04B10/25
[2021/30]
CPC:
H04B10/516 (EP,US); H04B10/25891 (US); H04L27/36 (EP,US);
H04L27/38 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/09]
Former [2021/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER SENDER, SYSTEM ZUR OPTISCHEN KOMMUNIKATION UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTISCHEN KOMMUNIKATION[2021/30]
English:OPTICAL TRANSMITTER, OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND OPTICAL COMMUNICATION METHOD[2021/30]
French:ÉMETTEUR OPTIQUE, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION OPTIQUE[2021/30]
Examination procedure26.01.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2022Examination requested  [2022/09]
26.01.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2024Fee for grant paid
15.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15849064.9  / EP3206311
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
12.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
25.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003067991  (OKAMOTO EIJI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044]; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2010061470  (WEI WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0032] - [0036]; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US2011293266  (AOKI YASUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0029] - [0036]; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP2498432  (KNOWLEDGE DEV FOR POF S L [ES]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0020] - [0030] - [0061] - [0086]; figure 6 *;
 [A]EP2571217  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [14.25] - [0031] - [0043]; figure 6 *
by applicantJP2003087345
 JP2009105748
 JP2011514736
 JP2011250291
 JP2014209346
 JP2015088334
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.