blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3889598

EP3889598 - CARRIER GAS REDUCTION FOR GAS CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.08.2024
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.04.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.07.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.09.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, PT, RO, SM
published on 21.05.2025 [2025/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thermo Finnigan LLC
355 River Oaks Parkway
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
[2021/40]
Inventor(s)01 / McCAULEY, Edward B.
1411 Knoll Ridge Drive
Cedar Park, TX Texas 78613 / US
 [2021/40]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[2021/40]
Application number, filing date21163261.717.03.2021
[2021/40]
Priority number, dateUS20201683901602.04.2020         Original published format: US202016839016
[2021/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3889598
Date:06.10.2021
Language:EN
[2021/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3889598
Date:11.09.2024
Language:EN
[2024/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2021
ClassificationIPC:G01N30/10
[2021/40]
CPC:
G01N30/10 (EP); G01N30/72 (CN); G01N30/32 (US);
G01N30/16 (US); G01N30/28 (CN); G01N30/7206 (US);
G01N2030/324 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/32]
Former [2021/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TRÄGERGASREDUKTION FÜR DIE GASCHROMATOGRAPHIE[2021/40]
English:CARRIER GAS REDUCTION FOR GAS CHROMATOGRAPHY[2021/40]
French:RÉDUCTION DU GAZ PORTEUR POUR LA CHROMATOGRAPHIE GAZEUSE[2021/40]
Examination procedure04.05.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
05.07.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2022Examination requested  [2022/32]
05.07.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.04.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2024Fee for grant paid
07.08.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.08.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
05.07.2022Request for further processing filed
05.07.2022Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.07.2022Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
IE, GB, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, HU, HR, GR, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
05.07.2022Request for further processing filed
05.07.2022Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.07.2022Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
05.07.2022Request for further processing filed
05.07.2022Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.07.2022Decision despatched
05.07.2022Request for further processing filed
05.07.2022Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.07.2022Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG11.09.2024
ES11.09.2024
FI11.09.2024
HR11.09.2024
LV11.09.2024
NL11.09.2024
RO11.09.2024
SM11.09.2024
NO11.12.2024
RS11.12.2024
GR12.12.2024
IS11.01.2025
PT13.01.2025
[2025/21]
Former [2025/13]BG11.09.2024
ES11.09.2024
FI11.09.2024
HR11.09.2024
LV11.09.2024
NL11.09.2024
NO11.12.2024
RS11.12.2024
GR12.12.2024
Former [2025/10]BG11.09.2024
ES11.09.2024
FI11.09.2024
HR11.09.2024
LV11.09.2024
NO11.12.2024
RS11.12.2024
GR12.12.2024
Former [2025/09]BG11.09.2024
FI11.09.2024
LV11.09.2024
NO11.12.2024
GR12.12.2024
Former [2025/08]FI11.09.2024
NO11.12.2024
GR12.12.2024
Documents cited:Search[A]US5954862  (WILSON WILLIAM H [US]);
 [A]US2008041137  (TIPLER ANDREW [US], et al);
 [XY]US2014260540  (O'NEIL GREGORY G [US], et al);
 [Y]US2017023534  (MCCAULEY EDWARD B [US]);
 [A]US9632064  (MCCAULEY EDWARD B [US], et al)
by applicantUS8371152
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.